McCall v. Davis Home & Development, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Betty McCall
Defendant: Davis Home & Development, LLC doing business as Cliff Davis Home Center, Lexington Homes, Inc. and Price Mobile Home Movers, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00147
Filed: February 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kelly F Pate
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Price Mobile Home Movers, Inc. and returned to counsel for personal service via special process server. (am, )
March 18, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Betty McCall. (Russell, Valerie)
March 18, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Davis Home & Development, LLC. (Windsor, Robert)
March 5, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Davis Home & Development, LLC. (am, )
March 5, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE by Davis Home & Development, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, Davis Home & Development, LLC's Notice of Consent to Removal (Ross, Brett) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/8/2021 to redact personal information contained in the original filing pursuant to the E-Government rules: #1 Redacted Main Document) (am, ).
March 5, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Davis Home & Development, LLC.(Ross, Brett) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/8/2021 to redact personal information contained in the original filing pursuant to the E-Government rules: #1 Redacted Main Document) (am, ).
March 5, 2021 JOINDER to #1 Notice of Removal, by Davis Home & Development, LLC. (NO PDF - See doc #8 ) (am, )
March 5, 2021 ***PURSUANT TO THE #7 ANSWER Attorney Robert David Windsor for Davis Home & Development, LLC added. (NO PDF attached to this entry) (am, )
February 24, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Lexington Homes, Inc. & Betty McCall. (am, )
February 18, 2021 Filing 5 Conflict Disclosure Statement by Lexington Homes, Inc. (am, )
February 18, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Compel Non-Binding Mediation and Binding Arbitration by Lexington Homes, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(am, )
February 18, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Lexington Homes, Inc.(am, )
February 18, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Service re #1 Notice of Removal by Lexington Homes, Inc. (am, )
February 18, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lexington Homes, Inc. from Circuit Court of Lowndes County, AL, case number 45-CV-2021-900004.00. (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number 4602061608) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A-State Court Record, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C-Notice of Filing to State Court, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Receipt)(am, )
February 18, 2021 COMPLAINT against Davis Home & Development, LLC, Lexington Homes, Inc., Price Mobile Home Movers, Inc., filed by Betty McCall. (NO PDF - See doc #1 )(am, )
February 18, 2021 NOTICE of Filing to State Court by Lexington Homes, Inc. (NO PDF - See doc #1 ) (am, )
February 18, 2021 BRIEF in Support of #4 Motion to Compel filed by Lexington Homes, Inc. (NO PDF - see doc #4 ) (am, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCall v. Davis Home & Development, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty McCall
Represented By: Valerie Rucker Russell
Represented By: Christina Diane Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis Home & Development, LLC doing business as Cliff Davis Home Center
Represented By: Robert David Windsor
Represented By: Brett Allen Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Homes, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Blake Lowe
Represented By: John Robert Bradwell, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Price Mobile Home Movers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?