Kister v. Siddiq et al (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: John Andrew Kister
Defendant: Maria Wynn, Tahir Siddiq and Wexford Health Sources, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00180
Filed: March 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: W Harold Albritton
Referring Judge: R Austin Huffaker
2 Judge: Kelly F Pate
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: it is ORDERED that by 5/19/2021, Plf must file a response that addresses each argument and defense raised by Defs, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 4/28/2021. (cwl, )
April 22, 2021 Filing 16 Special Report to Inmate 1983 Complaint , ANSWER to Amendment to Complaint by Tahir Siddiq, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Maria Wynn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A1, #3 Exhibit B)(Piggott, Philip)
April 21, 2021 Filing 15 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Wexford Health Sources, Inc.. (Piggott, Philip)
April 21, 2021 Filing 14 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Tahir Siddiq. (Piggott, Philip)
April 21, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Maria Wynn. (Piggott, Philip)
April 21, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Tahir Siddiq, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Maria Wynn.(Piggott, Philip)
April 21, 2021 AO FORM 85 mailed to counsel for Tahir Siddiq, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Maria Wynn. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, )
April 15, 2021 Filing 11 Return Receipt Cards showing service of #1 Inmate 1983 Complaint, #6 Amendment & #10 Order signed by O. H. for Tahir Siddiq, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Maria Wynn; served on 4/14/2021, answer due 5/25/2021. (cwl, )
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT by 5/25/2021; copies mailed to plf & General Counsel for Wexford Health Sources, Inc.; mailed by CMRRR with Complaint and Motion to Add Defendant (Docs. #1 and #6 ), on the individuals named as Defs. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 4/13/2021. (cwl, )
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: it is ORDERED: 1) The #6 Motion to Add Defs is GRANTED, and the Complaint is amended to add Wexford Health Services, Inc., as a Def. The Clerk is DIRECTED to take all necessary steps to amend the Court docket to reflect that Wexford Health Sources, Inc., is a named Def. 2) The #7 Motion Demanding Jury Trial, considered a motion for leave to file a jury demand and filed before Defs filed a response to the Complaint, is GRANTED to the extent Plf seeks to make a jury demand. The Clerk is DIRECTED to docket Plf's demand for a jury trial in this case. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 4/13/2021. (cwl, )
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: considering #5 a motion to vacate immediate collection of the initial partial filing fee, it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED to the extent set forth below. 1) The provision requiring payment of an initial partial filing fee in the Order entered on 3/10/2021 (Doc. #4 ), is VACATED. 2) The remaining directives in the Order, including the requirement of payment of the filing fee as funds become available to Plf (Doc. #4 at 2, para 1-2), remain in full force and effect. The Clerk is DIRECTED to furnish a copy of this Order to the inmate account clerk where Plf is detained. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 4/13/2021. (mailed to AC @ Bullock as directed) (cwl, )
April 12, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by John Andrew Kister. (NO pdf attached to this entry - see doc #7 for pdf) (cwl, )
April 12, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION Demanding Jury trial by John Andrew Kister. (bes, )
April 5, 2021 AMENDMENT TO #1 INMATE 1983 COMPLAINT against Wexford Health Sources, Inc., filed by John Andrew Kister. (NO pdf attached to this entry - see doc #6 for pdf) (cwl, )
April 5, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Add Defendant re #1 Inmate 1983 Complaint by John Andrew Kister. (cwl, )
April 5, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Pay Initial Partial Filing fee when funds available, considered a motion to vacate immediate collection of initial partial filing fee, pursuant to the Court' #8 Order re #4 Order, by John Andrew Kister. (cwl, ) Modified on 4/13/2021 (cwl, ).
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (Provision requiring payment of an initial partial filing fee VACATED pursuant to the Court's #8 Order) ORDER ON MOTION: granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $17.27 be paid on or before March 31, 2021; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plf and account clerk at Bullock Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 3/10/2021. (FURN: CASHIER) (cwl, ) Modified on 4/13/2021 (cwl, ).
March 4, 2021 Filing 3 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III as presiding Judge. Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (cwl, )
March 1, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by John Andrew Kister. (imm, )
March 1, 2021 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Tahir Siddiq, Maria Wynn, filed by John Andrew Kister. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Complaint)(imm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kister v. Siddiq et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Wynn
Represented By: Philip Piggott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tahir Siddiq
Represented By: Philip Piggott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Sources, Inc.
Represented By: Philip Piggott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Andrew Kister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?