Dickinson v. State of Alabama et al (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: Shawn Michael Dickinson
Defendant: State of Alabama, Patrice Richie Jones, Capt. McCorvey, CO I Blair, CO I Cunningham, Antonio McClain and Officer Cotrell
Case Number: 2:2021cv00281
Filed: April 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Referring Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2021 Filing 22 Response to Order re #14 Order by General Counsel for the Alabama Department of Corrections. (McCollum, Carrie)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ON MOTION granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Special Report & Answer; further ORDERED that these Dfts and Dft Blair are GRANTED an extension until 7/1/2021 to file their answer and special report. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 5/21/2021. (bes, )
May 21, 2021 Filing 20 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Officer Cotrell, Patrice Richie Jones, Antonio McClain, Capt. McCorvey. (Bledsoe, Jason)
May 21, 2021 Filing 19 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Special Report & Answer by Officer Cotrell, Patrice Richie Jones, Antonio McClain, Capt. McCorvey. (Bledsoe, Jason)
May 21, 2021 AO FORM 85 mailed to counsel for (Dfts) Officer Cotrell, Patrice Richie Jones, Antonio McClain, Capt. McCorvey. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, )
May 12, 2021 Filing 18 Return Receipt Card showing service of the #13 and #14 Orders signed by Micky Hill for DOC General Counsel, served on 5/5/2021.(bes, )
May 12, 2021 Filing 17 Return Receipt Card showing service of the #8 Order signed by Micky Hill for DOC General Counsel, served on 5/6/2021. (bes, )
May 10, 2021 Filing 16 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Inmate 1983 Complaint, #4 Order and #13 Order signed by OH for Officer Cotrell served on 5/6/2021, answer due 6/5/2021. (wcl, )
May 7, 2021 Filing 15 Return Receipt Card showing service of #14 Order, #1 Complaint, and #4 Order signed by J. Blair for CO I Blair served on 5/4/2021, answer due 6/13/2021. (bes, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/10/2021 to attach a redacted version removing the address pursuant to the #8 Order sealing the address: #1 Main Document (Redacted)) (wcl, ). Modified on 5/10/2021 (wcl, ).
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: it is ORDERED that within 40 days of service of these documents on dft Blair, he shall file an answer and written report in compliance with the directives of the #4 order of procedure; further ORDERED that: 1) On or before 5/19/2021, General Counsel for the Alabama Department of Corrections shall contact dft Blair and advise him of any potential legal representation available to him based on his employment with the Alabama Department of Corrections at the time of the actions relevant to the complaint; 2) On or before 5/26/2020, General Counsel for the Alabama Department of Corrections shall file a response with the court advising of any communication with dft Blair as to the matter of legal representation; mailed CMRRR with #1 Complaint and #4 Order to Justin Blair as directed; mailed CMRRR to ALDOC General Counsel. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 5/4/2021. (wcl, )
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ON MOTION granting #10 Motion for Leave to Amend to substitute Officer Cotrell as a dft for Officer Cunningham; Officer Cotrell shall file a written report and answer within 30 days of service of the complaint; copy mailed to ALDOC General Counsel; mailed CMRRR with copies of #1 Complaint and #4 Order to Officer Cotrell. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 5/4/2021. (wcl, )
May 3, 2021 Filing 12 SEALED DOCUMENT - Response to #6 Order. (wcl, )
May 3, 2021 Filing 11 Return Receipt Card showing service of #6 Order, signed by Micky Hill for ALDOC General Counsel served on 4/23/2021. (wcl, )
May 3, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Permission for Leave to Amend by Shawn Michael Dickinson. (wcl, )
May 3, 2021 Filing 9 Response to Order re #6 Order,, by General Counsel for the Alabama Department of Corrections. (McCollum, Carrie)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ON MOTION granting #7 Motion to File Dft's Home Address Under Seal; Upon receipt of Justin Blair's address the Clerk is DIRECTED to place such address under seal; copy mailed CMRRR to ALDOC General Counsel as directed. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 4/30/2021. (wcl, )
April 29, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Seal address by General Counsel for the Alabama Department of Corrections. (McCollum, Carrie)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before 5/3/2021, General Counsel for the Alabama Department of Corrections shall (1) provide the Court with the last known home or employment address the ADOC has on record for Officer Cunningham and Officer Blair, identified by the plf as correctional officers at the Bullock Correctional Facility in August of 2019, the time relevant to the complaint, OR (2) advise the Court of whether General Counsel or her designee will accept service and provide representation for these dfts; mailed CMRRR to ALDOC General Counsel as directed. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 4/20/2021. (wcl, )
April 19, 2021 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; Service package containing #1 Inmate 1983 Complaint and #4 Order sent to CO I Blair was returned with the following notation, "Return To Sender, Attn: This person is no longer employed with us." (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
April 19, 2021 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; Service package containing #1 Inmate 1983 Complaint and #4 Order sent to CO I Cunningham was returned with the following notation, "Return To Sender, Attention: There is no officer at Bullock Correctional Facility by the addressed name on this envelope." (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
April 16, 2021 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Inmate 1983 Complaint and #4 Order signed by OH for: CO I Blair served on 4/15/2021, answer due 5/24/2021; CO I Cunningham served on 4/15/2021, answer due 5/24/2021; Patrice Richie Jones served on 4/15/2021, answer due 5/24/2021; Antonio McClain served on 4/14/2021, answer due 5/24/2021; Capt. McCorvey served on 4/15/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (wcl, )
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT AND ANSWER on or before 5/24/2021; copies mailed to plf; mailed with #1 Complaint to ALDOC General Counsel; mailed by CMRRR with #1 complaint to individuals named as dfts. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 4/14/2021. (wcl, )
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON MOTION granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plf and account clerk at Bullock Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 4/14/2021. (Furn: Cashier) (bes, )
April 12, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Shawn Michael Dickinson. (hrs, )
April 12, 2021 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against CO I Blair, CO I Cunningham, Patrice Richie Jones, Antonio McClain, Capt. McCorvey, State of Alabama, filed by Shawn Michael Dickinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(hrs, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dickinson v. State of Alabama et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrice Richie Jones
Represented By: Jason Matthew Bledsoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt. McCorvey
Represented By: Jason Matthew Bledsoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO I Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO I Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio McClain
Represented By: Jason Matthew Bledsoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Cotrell
Represented By: Jason Matthew Bledsoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Michael Dickinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?