Brown v. Dunn et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Brown
Defendant: Patricia Jones, Jefferson S. Dunn and David Lamar
Case Number: 2:2021cv00440
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kelly F Pate
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #28 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Patricia Jones, David Lamar. (Harmon, Bart)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Patricia Jones, David Lamar. (Harmon, Bart)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #26 MOTION to Dismiss Commissioner Dunn's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint Commissioner Dunn's Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Jefferson S. Dunn. (Reeves, Matthew)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss Commissioner Dunn's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint by Jefferson S. Dunn. (Reeves, Matthew)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Reeves on behalf of Jefferson S. Dunn (Reeves, Matthew)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re #19 Second MOTION to Expedite Discovery ot Incarceated Eye-Witnesses filed by Jefferson S. Dunn, Patricia Jones, David Lamar. (Rogers, Stephen) Modified on 8/23/2021 to add joint filers & clarify text (cwl, ).
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Amendment to re #19 Second MOTION to Expedite Discovery to Incarcerated Eye-Witnesses by Jennifer Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Inmate social media post)(Sawyer, Kyle) Modified on 8/20/2021 clean up text (cwl, ).
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Clarence Rogers on behalf of Jefferson S. Dunn (Rogers, Stephen)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by William Richard Lunsford on behalf of Jefferson S. Dunn (Lunsford, William)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER Setting Motion Hearing on #19 Second MOTION to Expedite Discovery to Incarcerated Eye-Witnesses before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson for 8/23/2021 at 8:00 AM by telephone. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 8/17/2021. (No pdf attached to this entry) (furn: calendar, ag)(cwl, )
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Second MOTION to Expedite Discovery ot Incarceated Eye-Witnesses by Jennifer Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter listing witnesses)(Sawyer, Kyle)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson as presiding judge and Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate as referral judge; Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (bes, )
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: The parties should now confirm the decision to consent or request reassignment in writing by completing the appropriate attached form, as further set out in order. The completed form should be sent to the Clerk of Court by 8/18/2021. Neither the consent form nor the request for reassignment form should be filed electronically. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 7/28/2021. (cwl, )
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint is GRANTED to the extent that Defs' deadline to respond to the Complaint is extended to 8/23/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 7/28/2021. (cwl, )
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: it is ORDERED that Plf's #10 Motion to Expedite Discovery and Depose Witnesses is DENIED and that Plf is prohibited from deposing defs, deposing witnesses, or otherwise engaging in discovery before the parties have conferred as required by Rule 26(f). Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 7/28/2021. (cwl, )
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jefferson S. Dunn, Patricia Jones, David Lamar re #13 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Harmon, Bart)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Jefferson S. Dunn, Patricia Jones, David Lamar; Corporate Disclosures due by 7/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Statement Standing Order & Sample Format)(cwl, )
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (DEFS) Jefferson S. Dunn, Patricia Jones, David Lamar. (cwl, )
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by Jefferson S. Dunn, Patricia Jones, David Lamar. (Harmon, Bart) Modified on 7/19/2021 to correct motion event & clarify text (cwl, ).
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Expedite Discovery and Depose Witnesses by Jennifer Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter listing witnesses)(Sawyer, Kyle)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT against Jefferson S. Dunn, Patricia Jones, David Lamar, filed by Jennifer Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Death Certificate)(Sawyer, Kyle) Modified on 7/8/2021 to remove against "All Defendants" and add them individually (cwl, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2021: #2 Exhibit Death Certificate REDACTED) (cwl, ).
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Brown. David Lamar served on 6/28/2021, answer due 7/19/2021. (cwl, )
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Brown. Jefferson S. Dunn served on 6/29/2021, answer due 7/20/2021. (cwl, )
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Brown. Patricia Jones served on 7/1/2021, answer due 7/22/2021. (cwl, )
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jennifer Brown re #4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Sawyer, Kyle)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Jennifer Brown; Corporate Disclosures due by 7/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(bes, )
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (PLF) Jennifer Brown. (bes, )
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jefferson S. Dunn, Patricia Jones, David Lamar and returned to counsel for service via process server. (bes, )
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jefferson S. Dunn, Patricia Jones, David Lamar ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602063755.), filed by Jennifer Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(bes, )
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jennifer Brown. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 for PDF) (bes, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Dunn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Jones
Represented By: Bart Gregory Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson S. Dunn
Represented By: Bart Gregory Harmon
Represented By: Matthew Reeves
Represented By: Stephen Clarence Rogers
Represented By: William Richard Lunsford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Lamar
Represented By: Bart Gregory Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Brown
Represented By: Kyle David Sawyer
Represented By: Julian Lenwood McPhillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?