Jackson et al v. Onin Staffing LLC
Plaintiff: Chaunneyisha Jackson and Keyonia Davidson
Defendant: Onin Staffing LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00442
Filed: June 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Referring Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 GENERAL BRIEFING ORDER setting out further briefing requirements, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 8/16/2021. (bes, )
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/12/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2D before Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker Jr.;Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/5/2023; Jury Selection & Jury Trial set for 2/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Montgomery, AL before Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker Jr.; Dispositive & Daubert Motions due by 9/14/2022; Mediation Notice due by 8/20/2022; Amended Pleadings due by 11/19/2021; Discovery due by 8/15/2022, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 8/16/2021. (Furn: Calendar, dh)(bes, )
August 11, 2021 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Phillips, William)
August 10, 2021 Filing 8 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr. as Presiding Judge and Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams as Referral Judge; Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams no longer assigned to the case as Presiding Judge. (amf, )
July 13, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Onin Staffing LLC re #2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Lightfoot, Warren) Modified on 7/13/2021 to add the link to the #2 Notice (amf, ).
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 26(f) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/11/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 7/12/2021. (amf, )
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the parties should now make their selection in writing to consent or request reassignment; DIRECTING the parties to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 8/2/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 7/12/2021. (amf, )
July 7, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Onin Staffing LLC.(Lightfoot, Warren)
July 6, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for ALL PARTIES. (amf, )
July 6, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Defendant Onin Staffing LLC; Corporate Disclosures due by 7/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
June 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Onin Staffing LLC from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, AL, case number 03-CV-2020-901462.00. (Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number 4602063803) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Filing Fee Receipt)(amf, )
June 30, 2021 COMPLAINT against Onin Staffing LLC, filed by Chaunneyisha Jackson, Keyonia Davidson. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 - 1 for PDF)(amf, )
June 30, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Keyonia Davidson, Chaunneyisha Jackson. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 - 1 for PDF) (amf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson et al v. Onin Staffing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chaunneyisha Jackson
Represented By: Vicky Underwood Toles
Represented By: Norman Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keyonia Davidson
Represented By: Vicky Underwood Toles
Represented By: Norman Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onin Staffing LLC
Represented By: Warren Bricken Lightfoot, Jr.
Represented By: William Brock Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?