Wood v. City of Montgomery et al (MAG+)
Plaintiff: Freddie Eugene Wood, Jr.
Defendant: City of Montgomery, Montgomery County, Alabama, Daryl Bailey, John Joseph Gross, III, David Tibbs, Stan Ingram, State of Alabama, Alabama Board of Medical Examiners, John Joseph Groos, III and Michael Thomas
Case Number: 2:2021cv00465
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2021 Filing 50 NOTICE of Accepted service re #8 Summons Issued to Michael Thomas by Freddie Eugene Wood, Jr. (djy, )
August 23, 2021 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss Montgomery County from this action by Freddie Eugene Wood, Jr. (djy, )
August 23, 2021 Filing 48 MOTION to Dismiss City of Montgomery from this action by Freddie Eugene Wood, Jr. (djy, )
August 23, 2021 Set Answer Deadlines: Michael Thomas 9/9/2021 pursuant to #50 notice (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, )
August 18, 2021 Filing 47 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by City of Montgomery re #39 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Jones, Brittney)
August 12, 2021 Filing 46 MOTION to Dismiss by State of Alabama. (Howell, Laura)
August 11, 2021 Filing 45 Reply to Response to Order to Show Cause re #14 Order to Show Cause filed by Freddie Eugene Wood, Jr.. (amf, )
August 11, 2021 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave of Time Extension to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Freddie Eugene Wood, Jr.. (amf, )
August 10, 2021 Filing 43 NOTICE of Correction re #42 MOTION for James R. Seale to Withdraw as Counsel, to attach a corrected PDF document to remove erroneous counsel from the signature line. (Attachments: #1 Main PDF to Document #42 )(amf, )
August 10, 2021 Filing 42 MOTION for James R. Seale to Withdraw as Counsel by Montgomery County, Alabama. (Seale, James) (Main Document 42 replaced on 8/10/2021 to attach a corrected PDF document to remove erroneous counsel from the signature line) (amf, ). Modified on 8/10/2021 (amf, ).
August 10, 2021 Filing 41 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Montgomery County, Alabama re #38 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Gallion, Thomas) Modified on 8/10/2021 to add the link to the #38 Notice (amf, ).
August 10, 2021 Filing 40 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Daryl Bailey, John Joseph Groos, III, State of Alabama re #37 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Howell, Laura) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/10/2021: #1 Corrected Signature Page, #2 Corrected Certificate of Service) (amf, ). Modified on 8/10/2021 to add the link to the #37 Notice (amf, ).
August 10, 2021 Filing 39 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Defendant City of Montgomery; Corporate Disclosures due by 8/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
August 10, 2021 Filing 38 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Defendant Montgomery County, Alabama; Corporate Disclosures due by 8/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
August 10, 2021 Filing 37 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Defendants Daryl Bailey, John Joseph Groos, III, & State of Alabama; Corporate Disclosures due by 8/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, ) (amf, ). Modified on 8/10/2021 to remove as sent to Defendant David Tibbs; This defendant's conflict disclosure statement has already been filed (amf, ).
August 9, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss by City of Montgomery. (Jones, Brittney)
August 9, 2021 Filing 35 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Alabama Board of Medical Examiners, Stan Ingram re #14 Order to Show Cause,. (Seale, James)
August 4, 2021 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO DISMISS THE AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC. 6) BY DEFENDANT INVESTIGATOR DAVID TIBBS by David Tibbs. (Howell, Laura)
August 2, 2021 Filing 33 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Montgomery County, Alabama with the following US Postal Service notation, "returned to sender-undeliverable as addressed; unable to forward". (djy, )
July 29, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Correction re #30 MOTION to Dismiss to attach correct main PDF document (Attachments: #1 correct main document to Docket entry #30 )(djy, )
July 29, 2021 Filing 31 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #30 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Daryl Bailey, John Joseph Groos, III, State of Alabama, David Tibbs. (Howell, Laura)
July 29, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss by Daryl Bailey, John Joseph Groos, III, State of Alabama, David Tibbs. (Howell, Laura) (Main Document 30 replaced on 7/29/2021 to attach correct main PDF document) (qc/djy, ).
July 28, 2021 Filing 29 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & amended complaint signed by Patricia McCullough for Daryl Bailey served on (no date given), answer due 8/17/2021. (djy, )
July 26, 2021 ***PURSUANT TO THE #27 CONSENT TO REMOVAL - Attorney Stacy Lott Bellinger for Defendant City of Montgomery added. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
July 26, 2021 ***PURSUANT TO THE #26 CONSENT TO REMOVAL - Attorneys Thomas T. Gallion, III & James Robert Seale for Defendant Montgomery County, Alabama added. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
July 26, 2021 CONSENT to #1 Notice of Removal, by Daryl Bailey, John Joseph Groos, III, State of Alabama, David Tibbs. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #24 ). (djy, )
July 26, 2021 CONSENT to #1 Notice of Removal, by Alabama Board of Medical Examiners, Stan Ingram. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #25 ). (djy, )
July 26, 2021 CONSENT to #1 Notice of Removal, by Montgomery County, Alabama. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #26 ). (djy, )
July 26, 2021 CONSENT to #1 Notice of Removal, by City of Montgomery. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #27 ). (djy, )
July 26, 2021 Filing 28 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & amended complaint signed by Patricia McCullough for John Joseph Groos, III served on (no date given), answer due 8/16/2021. (djy, )
July 26, 2021 Filing 27 (CONSENT to Removal) RESPONSE in Support by City of Montgomery. (Jones, Brittney)
July 26, 2021 Filing 26 (CONSENT to Removal) NOTICE by Montgomery County, Alabama re #1 Notice of Removal (Seale, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/10/2021: #1 Corrected Signature Page) (amf, ).
July 26, 2021 Filing 25 (CONSENT to Removal) NOTICE by Alabama Board of Medical Examiners, Stan Ingram re #1 Notice of Removal (Seale, James)
July 26, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE by Daryl Bailey, John Joseph Groos, III, State of Alabama, David Tibbs Consent To Notice Of Removal (Howell, Laura)
July 23, 2021 Filing 23 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & amended complaint signed by MAR C-19 for Alabama Board of Medical Examiners served on 7/21/2021, answer due 8/11/2021. (djy, )
July 23, 2021 Filing 22 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & amended complaint signed by MAR C-19 for City of Montgomery served on 7/21/2021, answer due 8/11/2021. (djy, )
July 23, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Alabama Board of Medical Examiners, Stan Ingram. (Seale, James)
July 22, 2021 Filing 20 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & amended complaint signed by MAR C-19 for Stan Ingram served on 7/21/2021, answer due 8/11/2021. (djy, )
July 21, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to obtain grand jury transcripts; MEMORANDUM in support by Freddie Eugene Wood, Jr. (djy, )
July 21, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to disqualify defendants Alabama Board of Medical Examiners and Stan Ingram's counsel James Robert Seale by Freddie Eugene Wood, Jr. (djy, )
July 21, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to disqualify defendants' counsel at the Attorney General's office by Freddie Eugene Wood, Jr. (djy, )
July 21, 2021 Filing 16 Return Receipt Card signed by S Ingram for Stan Ingram on 7/17/2021 (djy, ) Modified on 7/23/2021 to clarify text to reflect this is not the return receipt care for the summons which were issued (qc/djy, ).
July 21, 2021 Filing 15 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & amended complaint signed by MTN C-19 for City of Montgomery served on 7/19/2021, answer due 8/9/2021. (djy, )
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER construing plf's #3 objection as a motion to remand case to state court; ORDER directing that on or before 8/11/2021, defs Alabama Board ofMedical Examiners and Stan Ingram SHOW CAUSE as to why #3 Motion to Remand to State Court should not be granted. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 7/21/21. (djy, )
July 20, 2021 Filing 13 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & amended complaint signed by David Tibbs for David Tibbs served on 7/16/2021, answer due 8/6/2021. (djy, )
July 19, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by David Tibbs. (Howell, Laura)
July 19, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by David Tibbs. (Howell, Laura)
July 19, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by David Tibbs. (Howell, Laura)
July 19, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Alabama Board of Medical Examiners, Stan Ingram. (Seale, James)
July 19, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to City of Montgomery, Montgomery County, Alabama, Daryl Bailey, John Joseph Groos, III, David Tibbs, Stan Ingram, Alabama Board of Medical Examiners, & Michael Thomas; mailed by CMRRR with #6 First Amended Complaint.(amf, )
July 19, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Freddie Eugene Wood, Jr.. (amf, )
July 19, 2021 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Alabama Board of Medical Examiners, Daryl Bailey, City of Montgomery, John Joseph Groos, III, Stan Ingram, Montgomery County, Alabama, State of Alabama, Michael Thomas, David Tibbs, filed by Freddie Eugene Wood, Jr..(amf, )
July 19, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Amended Filing by Freddie Eugene Wood, Jr.. (amf, )
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 for further proceedings and determination or recommendation as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/16/2021. (djy, )
July 14, 2021 Filing 3 Objection to #1 Notice of Removal filed by Freddie Eugene Wood, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(djy, )
July 9, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Alabama Board of Medical Examiners, Stan Ingram. (djy, )
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Alabama Board of Medical Examiners, Stan Ingram from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, AL, case number 03-CV-2021-312. ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602063947) (Attachments: #1 state court complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 fee receipt)(djy, )
July 9, 2021 COMPLAINT against Alabama Board of Medical Examiners, Daryl Bailey, City of Montgomery, John Joseph Gross, III, Stan Ingram, Montgomery County, Alabama, State of Alabama, David Tibbs, filed by Freddie Eugene Wood, Jr. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See docket entry #1 ).(djy, )
July 9, 2021 NOTICE to state court by Alabama Board of Medical Examiners, Stan Ingram re #1 filing of Notice of Removal (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #1 ). (djy, )
July 9, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Freddie Eugene Wood, Jr. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See docket entry #1 ). (djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood v. City of Montgomery et al (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddie Eugene Wood, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Montgomery
Represented By: Brittney F Jones
Represented By: Stacy Lott Bellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery County, Alabama
Represented By: James Robert Seale
Represented By: Thomas T. Gallion, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daryl Bailey
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Joseph Gross, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Tibbs
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stan Ingram
Represented By: Blake Henson
Represented By: Eric Wilson Hunter
Represented By: James Robert Seale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alabama
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Board of Medical Examiners
Represented By: Blake Henson
Represented By: Eric Wilson Hunter
Represented By: James Robert Seale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Joseph Groos, III
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?