Bankston et al v. Alabama Public Service Commission
Plaintiff: James H. Bankston, Jr., Ralph B. Pfeiffer, Jr., Mark Johnston, Teresa K. Thorne and GASP, Inc.
Defendant: Alabama Public Service Commission, Twinkle Andress Cavanaugh, Jeremy H. Oden and Chris Chip Beeker
Case Number: 2:2021cv00469
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: Kelly F Pate
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 16 U.S.C. ยง 824
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Filing 24 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Chris Chip Beeker. (Bentley, Luther)
September 9, 2021 Filing 23 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jeremy H. Oden. (Bentley, Luther)
September 9, 2021 Filing 22 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Twinkle Andress Cavanaugh. (Bentley, Luther)
September 9, 2021 Filing 21 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Alabama Public Service Commission. (Bentley, Luther)
September 9, 2021 Filing 20 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Alabama Public Service Commission, Chris Chip Beeker, Twinkle Andress Cavanaugh, Jeremy H. Oden. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration and Exhibits)(Bentley, Luther)
September 9, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Alabama Public Service Commission, Chris Chip Beeker, Twinkle Andress Cavanaugh, Jeremy H. Oden. (Bentley, Luther)
August 16, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for All Defendants, Alabama Public Service Commission, Chris Chip Beeker, Twinkle Andress Cavanaugh, Jeremy H. Oden (dmn, )
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER: For good cause shown under FRCP 6, it is ORDERED that Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time (Doc. #16 ) is GRANTED. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' first amended complaint on or before 9/9/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 8/16/2021. (dmn, ) (no pdf)
August 12, 2021 Filing 16 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Time to File a Responsive Pleading to #12 First Amended Complaint by Alabama Public Service Commission, Chris Chip Beeker, Twinkle Andress Cavanaugh, Jeremy H. Oden. (Bentley, Luther) Modified on 8/16/2021 to reflect actual title, correct motion event. (dmn, )
August 12, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Victor Chad Mason, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Mason, Victor)
August 12, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Luther Daniel Bentley on behalf of All Defendants (Bentley, Luther)
August 5, 2021 Filing 13 Summons Issued; summons and #12 amended complaint mailed CMRRR to Chris Chip Beeker, Twinkle Andress Cavanaugh, Jeremy H. Oden. (dmn, )
August 2, 2021 Filing 12 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Alabama Public Service Commission, Twinkle Andress Cavanaugh, Jeremy H. Oden, Chris Chip Beeker, filed by Teresa K. Thorne, GASP, Inc., James H. Bankston, Jr, Ralph B. Pfeiffer, Jr, Mark Johnston. (with Exhibits A, B, C included in main document pdf) (Johnston, Keith) Modified on 8/4/2021 to remove "All Defendants" text; new party names did not appear in docket text; and to also reflect exhibits are included in main document; exhibits were not attached as separate pdfs. Duplicate party names added to database by addition of newly named parties in this event removed, party names corrected to remove (") along with other errors, party text added correctly, addresses removed from showing on docket sheet. (dmn, )
July 23, 2021 Filing 11 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint, #8 Summons, Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statements (Docs. #2 , #3 , #4 , #5 ) signed by Brad Chynoweth for The Honorable Steve Marshall, Attorney General, Office of the Attorney General, 501 Washington Avenue, Montgomery, AL 36104 served 7/19/2021. (dmn, )
July 22, 2021 Filing 10 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint, #8 Summons, Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statements (Docs. #2 , #3 , #4 , #5 ) signed by name illegible for c/o Walter L. Thomas, Jr., Secretary, Alabama Public Service Commission served on 7/19/2021, Alabama Public Service Commission answer due 8/9/2021. (dmn, )
July 16, 2021 Filing 9 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle. Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (djy, )
July 16, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Alabama Public Service Commission and Attorney General of AL and mailed CMRRR with copy of complaint and 5 corporate disclosures. (djy, )
July 16, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (all plaintiffs) James H. Bankston, Jr, GASP, Inc., Mark Johnston, Ralph B. Pfeiffer, Jr, Teresa K. Thorne. (djy, )
July 12, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by GASP, Inc.. (djy, )
July 12, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Mark Johnston. (djy, )
July 12, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Teresa K. Thorne. (djy, )
July 12, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Ralph B. Pfeiffer, Jr. (djy, )
July 12, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by James H. Bankston, Jr. (djy, )
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for declaratory and equitable relief against Alabama Public Service Commission ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602063950.), filed by Teresa K. Thorne, GASP, Inc., James H. Bankston, Jr, Ralph B. Pfeiffer, Jr, Mark Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 fee receipt)(djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bankston et al v. Alabama Public Service Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James H. Bankston, Jr.
Represented By: Milton Clay Ragsdale
Represented By: Allison Lea Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph B. Pfeiffer, Jr.
Represented By: Milton Clay Ragsdale
Represented By: Allison Lea Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Johnston
Represented By: Christina Andreen Tidwell
Represented By: Kurt David Ebersbach
Represented By: Keith Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa K. Thorne
Represented By: Christina Andreen Tidwell
Represented By: Kurt David Ebersbach
Represented By: Keith Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GASP, Inc.
Represented By: Christina Andreen Tidwell
Represented By: Kurt David Ebersbach
Represented By: Keith Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Public Service Commission
Represented By: Luther Daniel Bentley
Represented By: Victor Chad Mason, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twinkle Andress Cavanaugh
Represented By: Luther Daniel Bentley
Represented By: Victor Chad Mason, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy H. Oden
Represented By: Luther Daniel Bentley
Represented By: Victor Chad Mason, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Chip Beeker
Represented By: Luther Daniel Bentley
Represented By: Victor Chad Mason, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?