Hamilton v. Dunn et al
Plaintiff: Arthur Hamilton
Defendant: Jefferson Dunn, Kim Thomas, Gwendolyn Givens, Deborah Toney, Cynthia Stewart and Gary Hetzel
Case Number: 2:2021cv00504
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kelly F Pate
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (DEFS) Jefferson Dunn, Gary Hetzel, Deborah Toney. (cwl, )
September 24, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response by Jefferson Dunn, Gary Hetzel, Deborah Toney. (Harmon, Bart) Modified on 9/24/2021 to correct motion event (cwl, ).
September 24, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jefferson Dunn, Gary Hetzel, Deborah Toney. (Harmon, Bart)
September 24, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Carrie G Shaw on behalf of Jefferson Dunn, Gary Hetzel, Deborah Toney (Shaw, Carrie)
September 24, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Bart Gregory Harmon on behalf of Jefferson Dunn, Gary Hetzel, Deborah Toney (Harmon, Bart)
September 21, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Kim Thomas with the following notation, "Return to sender, unclaimed. Counsel is notified via this notice regarding unperfected service. (cwl, )
September 7, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Cynthia Stewart with the following notation, "Return to sender, Attempted not known". Counsel is notified via this notice regarding unperfected service. (cwl, )
September 2, 2021 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #4 Summons signed by illegible for Gary Hetzel served on 8/31/2021, answer due 9/21/2021. (cwl, )
August 30, 2021 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #4 Summons signed by LCF for Deborah Toney served on 8/27/2021 per USPS website, answer due 9/17/2021. (cwl, )
August 26, 2021 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #4 Summons signed by Barbara Baldwin for Jefferson Dunn served on 8/24/2021, answer due 9/14/2021. (cwl, )
August 20, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Jefferson Dunn, Gwendolyn Givens, Gary Hetzel, Cynthia Stewart, Kim Thomas, Deborah Toney; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (cwl, )
August 3, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Plaintiff Arthur Hamilton. (amf, )
July 29, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement filed by Arthur Hamilton. (amf, )
July 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jefferson Dunn, Gwendolyn Givens, Gary Hetzel, Cynthia Stewart, Kim Thomas, Deborah Toney (Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number 4602064106), filed by Arthur Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Order of 7/20/2020 Dismissing Revocation Charges, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Filing Fee Receipt)(amf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton v. Dunn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Hamilton
Represented By: Dustin Judd Fowler
Represented By: Shanon Dale Haack
Represented By: Stephen Talmadge Etheredge, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Dunn
Represented By: Bart Gregory Harmon
Represented By: Carrie G Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwendolyn Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Toney
Represented By: Bart Gregory Harmon
Represented By: Carrie G Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Hetzel
Represented By: Bart Gregory Harmon
Represented By: Carrie G Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?