Freeman v. Alabama Department of Revenue (MAG+)
Plaintiff: Persephanie Chanelle Freeman
Defendant: Alabama Department of Revenue
Case Number: 2:2021cv00536
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Emily C Marks
Referring Judge: Kelly F Pate
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Plf's request to be referred to PSAP is DENIED; The Clerk is directed to STAY service of process so the Court may conduct its obligatory review of the Complaint pursuant to 28 USC 1915(e). Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 10/7/2021. (bes, )
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE: it is ORDERED that, pursuant to 28 USC 636, this case is REFERRED to the US Magistrate Judge for all pretrial proceedings and entry of any orders or recommendations as may be appropriate. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 9/2/2021. (bes, )
September 1, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Persephanie Chanelle Freeman re #4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (bes, )
September 1, 2021 Filing 5 INFORMATION of the pro se party for Participation in the Pro Se Assistance Program by Persephanie Chanelle Freeman. (bes, )
August 16, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Persephanie Chanelle Freeman; Corporate Disclosures due by 8/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(bes, )
August 11, 2021 Filing 3 DECLARATION of the pro se party to Participate in the Pro Se Assistance Program by Persephanie Chanelle Freeman. (bes, )
August 11, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Persephanie Chanelle Freeman. (bes, )
August 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alabama Department of Revenue, filed by Persephanie Chanelle Freeman. (Attachments: #1 Letter Attachment)(bes, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeman v. Alabama Department of Revenue (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Persephanie Chanelle Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?