Scott v. Dunn et al
Plaintiff: Darryl Elton Scott
Defendant: Jefferson S. Dunn, Antonio McClain, Corrections Officer Hosley, Corrections Officer Baskin, Classification Specialist, Corrections Officer Boyd, Corrections Officer Upshaw, Corrections Officer Jones, Corrections Officer Roseman, Corrections Officer Sharp, Corrections Officer Hutton, Gwendolyn Givens, Eloise Urquhart, Warden Jones, Corrections Officer McCorvey, Larry White, Thomas Moody, Quindon Turner and Antonio Wallace
Case Number: 2:2021cv00573
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Myron H Thompson
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2021 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by the Alabama Department of Corrections showing service of summons on Dft Quindon J. Turner, served on 9/23/2021. (bes, )
October 5, 2021 Filing 20 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Corrections Officer McCorvey with the following notation, "Return To Sender, No Officer McCovery Works at ADOC, Not Deliverable As Addressed, Unable To Forward." Plf's counsel is notified via this notice that service has not been perfected for this Dft.(es, )
September 30, 2021 Filing 19 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by O. Hicks for Corrections Officer Jones served on 9/29/2021, answer due 10/20/2021; Warden Jones served on 9/29/2021, answer due 10/20/2021. (bes, )
September 29, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Thomas Moody. (bes, )
September 28, 2021 Filing 17 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Corrections Officer Upshaw with the following notation, "Return To Sender, Refused, Unable To Forward." Plf's counsel is notified via this notice that service has not been perfected for this Dft. (bes, )
September 24, 2021 Filing 16 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Corrections Officer Baskin with the following notation, "Return To Sender, Refused, Unable To Forward." Plf's counsel is notified via this notice that service has not been perfected for this Dft. (bes, )
September 24, 2021 Filing 15 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Corrections Officer Hosley with the following notation, "Return To Sender, Refused, Unable To Forward." Plf's counsel is notified via this notice that service has not been perfected for this Dft. (bes, )
September 24, 2021 Filing 14 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Corrections Officer Sharp was returned with the following notation, :Return To Sender, Return To Sender, Fountain Facility." Plf's counsel is notified via this notice that service has not been perfected for this Dft. (bes, )
September 24, 2021 Filing 13 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Corrections Officer Roseman with the following notation, "Return To Sender, No Longer Work At ADOC, Return To Sender, Refused, Unable To Forward." Plf's counsel is notified via this notice that service has not been perfected for this Dft. (bes, )
September 24, 2021 Filing 12 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by LCF for Larry White served on 9/7/2021 (per USPS website), answer due 9/28/2021. (bes, )
September 23, 2021 Filing 11 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by illegible for Eloise Urquhart served on 9/7/2021 (per USPS tracking website), answer due 9/28/2021. (bes, )
September 22, 2021 Filing 10 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by Sharon B. for Corrections Officer Boyd served on 9/20/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (bes, )
September 20, 2021 Filing 9 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by Samantha Jones for Quindon Turner served on 9/15/2021, answer due 10/6/2021. (bes, )
September 17, 2021 Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by LCF for Antonio Wallace served on 9/7/2021 (per USPS tracking website), answer due 9/28/2021. (bes, )
September 16, 2021 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by Sharon B. for Thomas Moody served on 9/13/2021, answer due 10/4/2021. (bes, )
September 13, 2021 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by Irma Shorrill for Classification Specialist served on 9/9/2021, answer due 9/30/2021. (bes, )
September 13, 2021 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by Barbara Baldwin for Jefferson S. Dunn served on 9/9/2021, answer due 9/30/2021. (bes, )
September 2, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Darryl Elton Scott re #2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Adams, John) Modified on 9/3/2021 to add the link to the #2 Notice (bes, ).
September 2, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Corrections Officer Baskin, Corrections Officer Boyd, Jefferson S. Dunn, Gwendolyn Givens, Corrections Officer Hosley, Corrections Officer Hutton, Corrections Officer Jones, Warden Jones, Antonio McClain, Corrections Officer McCorvey, Thomas Moody, Corrections Officer Roseman, Corrections Officer Sharp, Classification Specialist, Quindon Turner, Corrections Officer Upshaw, Eloise Urquhart, Antonio Wallace, Larry White; mailed CMRRR with a copy of the #1 Complaint. (bes, )
September 1, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Darryl Elton Scott; Corporate Disclosures due by 9/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(bes, )
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Corrections Officer Baskin, Corrections Officer Boyd, Jefferson S. Dunn, Gwendolyn Givens, Corrections Officer Hosley, Corrections Officer Hutton, Corrections Officer Jones, Warden Jones, Antonio McClain, Corrections Officer McCorvey, Thomas Moody, Corrections Officer Roseman, Corrections Officer Sharp, Classification Specialist, Quindon Turner, Corrections Officer Upshaw, Eloise Urquhart, Antonio Wallace, Larry White ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602064501.), filed by Darryl Elton Scott. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(bes, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Dunn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Elton Scott
Represented By: Carolyn Elizabeth Litte Courson
Represented By: John Livingston Adams
Represented By: Carolyn Elizabeth Littell Courson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson S. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrections Officer Hosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrections Officer Baskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Classification Specialist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrections Officer Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrections Officer Upshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrections Officer Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrections Officer Roseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrections Officer Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrections Officer Hutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwendolyn Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eloise Urquhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrections Officer McCorvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quindon Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?