Harris v. Alabama Department of Corrections et al (MAG+)
Plaintiff: Kendrick Lee Harris
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections, D. Whitley, Captain Pickens, Walter Myers, K. Thomas, William Streeter and C.O. Boulier
Case Number: 2:2021cv00586
Filed: September 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Charles S Coody
Referring Judge: Kelly F Pate
2 Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: it is ORDERED that, by 11/15/2021, Plf must amend his pending motion by completing and filing the Court's long-form application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; The Clerk is DIRECTED to provide Plf with a copy of the long-form application with this Order. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 11/1/2021. (bes, )
October 27, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kendrick Lee Harris. (bes, )
October 27, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kendrick Lee Harris (bes, )
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: it is ORDERED that Plf's #2 motion is DENIED and that Plf must pay the civil filing fee in full by 10/21/2021; If Plf fails to pay the filing fee, thisaction may be dismissed for failure to prosecute and abide by court orders; The Clerk is DIRECTED to stay service of process pending further notice from theCourt. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 10/7/2021. (bes, )
September 14, 2021 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate as referral judge; Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody no longer assigned to the case. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, )
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE, pursuant to 28 USC 636, to the United States Magistrate Judge for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 9/13/2021. (es, )
September 3, 2021 COMPLAINT against Alabama Department of Corrections, C.O. Boulier, Walter Myers, Captain Pickens, William Streeter, K. Thomas, D. Whitley, filed by Kendrick Lee Harris. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 for PDF)(bes, )
September 3, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Kendrick Lee Harris. (bll, )
September 3, 2021 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Alabama Department of Corrections, C.O. Boulier, Walter Myers, Captain Pickens, William Streeter, K. Thomas, D. Whitley, filed by Kendrick Lee Harris. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(bll, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Alabama Department of Corrections et al (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendrick Lee Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Whitley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Pickens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Streeter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Boulier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?