Brackins et al v. SoClean, Inc.
Plaintiff: Paul Brackins, Rosetta Dejarnett, Shelly Key and Jonathan Griffin
Defendant: SoClean, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00651
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Emily C Marks
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
2 Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by SoClean, Inc.. (Tompkins, Jason)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: It is ORDERED that defendant's unopposed motion for an extension of time to respond to the complaint (Doc. #9 ) is granted, and the deadline for defendant to file a response to the complaint, currently 11/4/2021,is extended to 21 days after the Judicial Panel on MDL rules upon a pending request to consolidate this action with others in a multidistrict litigation proceeding. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/22/2021. (es, )
October 22, 2021 Filing 11 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to SoClean, Inc.; Corporate Disclosures due by 11/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order & Sample Format)(es, )
October 22, 2021 Filing 10 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson as presiding judge. Chief Judge Emily C. Marks no longer assigned to the case. (es, )
October 21, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer as to #1 Complaint, by SoClean, Inc.. (Burkhart, Charles) Modified on 10/22/2021 to correct event code used for docketing to extension of time to answer (qc/djy, ).
October 21, 2021 Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint signed by Rashad Dickinson for SoClean, Inc. served on 10/14/2021, answer due 11/4/2021. (es, )
October 14, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jonathan Griffin re #2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Hamil, Jubal)
October 14, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Shelly Key re #2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Hamil, Jubal)
October 14, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Rosetta Dejarnett re #2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Hamil, Jubal)
October 14, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Paul Brackins re #2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Hamil, Jubal)
October 12, 2021 ***PURSUANT TO THE #9 MOTION - Attorney Jason Brent Tompkins for SoClean, Inc. added. (NO PDF attached to this entry) (am, )
October 8, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to SoClean, Inc.; and mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (hfc, )
October 8, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Paul Brackins, Rosetta Dejarnett, Shelly Key, & Jonathan Griffin; Corporate Disclosures due by 10/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, )
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against SoClean, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602064815.), filed by Shelly Key, Paul Brackins, Rosetta Dejarnett, Jonathan Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 fee receipt)(djy, ) Modified on 10/5/2021 to clarify text to reflect as CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (qc/djy, ).
September 30, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Paul Brackins, Rosetta Dejarnett, Jonathan Griffin, Shelly Key. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See docket entry #1 ). (djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brackins et al v. SoClean, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Brackins
Represented By: Jubal L. Hamil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosetta Dejarnett
Represented By: Jubal L. Hamil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelly Key
Represented By: Jubal L. Hamil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Griffin
Represented By: Jubal L. Hamil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SoClean, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Alan Burkhart
Represented By: Jason Brent Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?