Morgan et al v. Hansen & Adkins Auto Transport, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Hayle Morgan, Roma Fox, James Whited, Katelin Whited and Malana Whited
Defendant: Hansen & Adkins Auto Transport, Inc., Asmat Investment, LLC doing business as Asmat Express and Mamuye Ayane Takelu
Case Number: 2:2021cv00652
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Referring Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2021 Filing 22 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks as Presiding Judge and Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams as Referral Judge; Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams no longer assigned to the case as Presiding Judge. (amf, )
November 18, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Correction re #20 Joint Agreed MOTION to Consolidate All Matters for Discovery and Partially Agreed MOTION to Consolidate First Three Matters for Trial, to attach a corrected PDF document to pursuant to telephonic communication with Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Main PDF to Document #20 )(amf, )
November 17, 2021 BRIEF in Support re #20 Joint Agreed MOTION to Consolidate All Matters for Discovery and Partially Agreed MOTION to Consolidate First Three Matters for Trial filed by Asmat Investment, LLC, Roma Fox, Hansen & Adkins Auto Transport, Inc., Hayle Morgan, Mamuye Ayane Takelu, James Whited, Katelin Whited, Malana Whited. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #20 for PDF) (amf, )
November 17, 2021 Filing 20 Joint Agreed MOTION to Consolidate All Matters for Discovery and Partially Agreed MOTION to Consolidate First Three Matters for Trial and Brief in Support by Asmat Investment, LLC, Mamuye Ayane Takelu, Hansen & Adkins Auto Transport, Inc., Hayle Morgan, James Whited, Katelin Whited, Malana Whited, Roma Fox. (Rogers, Jannea) (Main Document 20 replaced on 11/18/2021 to attach a corrected PDF document to pursuant to telephonic communication with Counsel) (amf, ). Modified on 11/18/2021 to add additional filers (amf, ). Added Partially Agreed MOTION to Consolidate First Three Matters for Trial on 11/18/2021 (amf, ).
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: The parties in this case have been notified that this case has been assigned to a Magistrate Judge. (Docs. No. #2 , #11 , #16 ); Each party has the right to consent or request reassignment of this matter to a district judge; ORDERED that the parties should now make their selection in writing to consent or request reassignment; DIRECTING the parties to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 12/2/2021; If a party elects to complete the form requesting reassignment to a district judge, counsel must complete the attached form and mail it to the Clerk's Office, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 11/12/2021. (es, )
November 11, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Edward Bishop Stewart on behalf of Hansen & Adkins Auto Transport, Inc. (Stewart, Joseph)
November 11, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Wayne Lewis on behalf of Hansen & Adkins Auto Transport, Inc. (Lewis, Richard)
November 10, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (DFTS) Asmat Investment, LLC, Mamuye Ayane Takelu (es, )
November 9, 2021 ***Attorney Blake T. Richardson added for Asmat Investment, LLC, Mamuye Ayane Takelu. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #12 and #13 ) (es, )
November 9, 2021 Filing 15 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Mamuye Ayane Takelu. (Rogers, Jannea)
November 9, 2021 Filing 14 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Asmat Investment, LLC. (Rogers, Jannea)
November 9, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Asmat Investment, LLC.(Rogers, Jannea)
November 9, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Mamuye Ayane Takelu.(Rogers, Jannea)
November 4, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (DFT) Hansen & Adkins Auto Transport, Inc. (es, )
November 2, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Dft Hansen & Adkins Auto Transport, Inc..(No PDF document attached - see docket entry #9 )(es, )
November 2, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Hansen & Adkins Auto Transport, Inc.. (Pipkin, William)
November 2, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Hansen & Adkins Auto Transport, Inc..(Pipkin, William) Modified on 11/4/2021 to correct typed docket text (qc/es, ).
October 29, 2021 Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint signed by Faslka Gete for Asmat Investment, LLC served on 10/25/2021, answer due 11/15/2021. (es, )
October 22, 2021 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by Mayume Takelu for Mamuye Ayane Takelu served on 10/19/2021, answer due 11/9/2021. (bes, )
October 18, 2021 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by Rashad Dickinson for Hansen & Adkins Auto Transport, Inc. served on 10/12/2021, answer due 11/2/2021. (bes, )
October 6, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Roma Fox, Hayle Morgan, James Whited, Katelin Whited, Malana Whited re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Cole, Kenneth)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Asmat Investment, LLC, Hansen & Adkins Auto Transport, Inc., Mamuye Ayane Takelu and mailed CMRRR with #1 Complaint. (es, )
October 4, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to James Whited, Malana Whited, Hayle Morgan, Katelin Whited, Roma Fox; Corporate Disclosures due by 10/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(bes, )
October 4, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (PLFs) Roma Fox, Hayle Morgan, James Whited, Katelin Whited, Malana Whited. (bes, )
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Asmat Investment, LLC, Hansen & Adkins Auto Transport, Inc., Mamuye Ayane Takelu ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602064816.), filed by James Whited, Malana Whited, Hayle Morgan, Katelin Whited, Roma Fox. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(bes, )
October 1, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Roma Fox, Hayle Morgan, James Whited, Katelin Whited, Malana Whited.(No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 for PDF) (bes, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan et al v. Hansen & Adkins Auto Transport, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hayle Morgan
Represented By: Andrew Francis Banks
Represented By: Gary V. Conchin
Represented By: Kenneth Bridges Cole, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roma Fox
Represented By: Andrew Francis Banks
Represented By: Gary V. Conchin
Represented By: Kenneth Bridges Cole, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Whited
Represented By: Andrew Francis Banks
Represented By: Gary V. Conchin
Represented By: Kenneth Bridges Cole, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katelin Whited
Represented By: Andrew Francis Banks
Represented By: Gary V. Conchin
Represented By: Kenneth Bridges Cole, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malana Whited
Represented By: Andrew Francis Banks
Represented By: Gary V. Conchin
Represented By: Kenneth Bridges Cole, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hansen & Adkins Auto Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Edward Bishop Stewart
Represented By: Richard Wayne Lewis
Represented By: William Eugene Pipkin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asmat Investment, LLC doing business as Asmat Express
Represented By: Blake T. Richardson
Represented By: Jannea Suzanne Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mamuye Ayane Takelu
Represented By: Blake T. Richardson
Represented By: Jannea Suzanne Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?