American Pride Properties, LLC v. Miller et al (MAG +)
Plaintiff: American Pride Real Properties, LLC and American Pride Properties, LLC
Defendant: George A. Miller, Jr., Ozelle C. Miller and Fredrika M. Miller
Case Number: 2:2021cv00674
Filed: October 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by American Pride Properties, LLC. (Miner, Joseph)
October 22, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by George A. Miller, Jr re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (cwl, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/12/2021: #1 COS Signature Page) (es, ).
October 22, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Fredrika M. Miller re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (cwl, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/12/2021: #1 COS Signature Page) (es, ).
October 22, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Ozelle C. Miller re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (cwl, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/12/2021: #1 COS Signature Page) (es, ).
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to the Magistrate Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 for further proceedings and determination or recommendation as may be appropriate. The clerk is DIRECTED to update the docket sheet to reflect the correct name of Plf. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 10/19/2021. (cwl, )
October 13, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Fredrika M. Miller, George A. Miller, Jr, Ozelle C. Miller. Corporate Disclosures due by 10/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Statement Standing Order & Sample Format)(cwl, )
October 8, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Fredrika M. Miller, George A. Miller, Jr, Ozelle C. Miller. (Attachments: #1 Application)(cwl, )
October 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Fredrika M. Miller, George A. Miller, Jr, Ozelle C. Miller from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, case number 03-CV-20-901457.00. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B) (cwl, )
October 8, 2021 COMPLAINT against Fredrika M. Miller, George A. Miller, Jr, Ozelle C. Miller, filed by American Pride Real Properties, LLC. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf)(cwl, )
October 8, 2021 NOTICE of Filing to State Court by Fredrika M. Miller, George A. Miller, Jr, Ozelle C. Miller re #1 Notice of Removal. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf) (cwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Pride Properties, LLC v. Miller et al (MAG +)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Pride Real Properties, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Todd Miner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Pride Properties, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Todd Miner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George A. Miller, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ozelle C. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fredrika M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?