Kent v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (MAG +)
Plaintiff: Rory L. Kent, Sr.
Defendant: Steven D. Fredrickson doing business as Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC and Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00698
Filed: October 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Emily C Marks
Referring Judge: Kelly F Pate
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2021 Filing 17 SECOND Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Plaintiff Rory L. Kent, Sr.; Corporate Disclosures due by 12/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
December 13, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Rory L. Kent, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(es, )
December 6, 2021 Filing 15 Return Receipt Card showing service of #14 Order to Show Cause, signed by (No Signature) for Rory L. Kent, Sr., served on 12/2/2021 (per USPS website). (amf, )
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: it is ORDERED that, by 12/14/2021, Plaintiff must file a written response and show cause why the #12 motion to dismiss should not be granted. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 11/30/2021. (Mailed by CMRRR & by regular mail to pro se Plaintiff)(amf, )
November 29, 2021 Filing 13 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Plaintiff Rory L. Kent, Sr.; Corporate Disclosures due by 12/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
November 29, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Steven D. Fredrickson. (Moon, Stacy) Modified on 11/29/2021 (amf, ).
November 18, 2021 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Moon, Stacy)
November 15, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Rory L. Kent, Sr.. (amf, )
November 10, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by Rory L. Kent, Sr (hfc, )
November 10, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Steven D. Fredrickson re #7 Order, #3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement, #2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Moon, Stacy)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement; it is ORDERED that Dft has until 11/10/2021, to correct this deficiency. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 11/3/2021. (hfc, )
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for More Definite Statement; By 11/19/2021, Plf must file an amendment to his Complaint that complies with this Order. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 10/29/2021. (hfc, )
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 to the United States Magistrate Judge for all pretrial proceedings and entry of any orders or recommendations as may be appropriate. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 10/25/2021. (cwl, )
October 25, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Steven D. Fredrickson. (Moon, Stacy)
October 22, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Steven D. Fredrickson re #2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Moon, Stacy)
October 22, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Steven D. Fredrickson. Corporate Disclosures due by 11/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Statement Standing Order & Sample Format)(cwl, )
October 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Steven D. Fredrickson from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, case number 03-SM-20-000495.00. ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602064993) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 receipt)(cwl, )
October 19, 2021 COMPLAINT against Steven D. Fredrickson, filed by Rory L. Kent, Sr.(No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf)(cwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kent v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (MAG +)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rory L. Kent, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven D. Fredrickson doing business as Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Represented By: Stacy Linn Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Represented By: Stacy Linn Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?