United States of America v. Murphy-Thomas et al (MAG+)
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Christi Murphy-Thomas
Garnishee: Alabama Middle Federal Defenders Program, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021mc03936
Filed: March 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: It is ORDERED as follows: (1) The Clerk is DIRECTED to assign a US Magistrate Judge to this case; and (2) Under 28 USC 636, this case is REFERRED to the US Magistrate Judge for consideration of Dft's #6 motion for a hearing, as well as for disposition or recommendation, as may be appropriate, on all matters. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 4/13/2021. (bes, )
April 13, 2021 PURSUANT TO THE #7 ORDER - Motion No Longer Referred: #6 MOTION for Hearing MOTION to Stay (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, )
April 13, 2021 Case assigned to Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle as referral Judge. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, )
April 12, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION (request) for a Hearing and Stay of the Pending Writ by Christi Murphy-Thomas. (bes, )
April 5, 2021 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #3 Writ of Garnishment, #1 Application for Writ of Garnishment served on Christi Murphy-Thomas on 4/2/2021. (bes, )
April 5, 2021 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #3 Writ of Garnishment, #1 Application for Writ of Garnishment served on Alabama Middle Federal Defenders Program, Inc. on 4/2/2021. (bes, )
March 10, 2021 Filing 3 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued & furnished to USMS for service. (amf, )
March 8, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by United States of America. (bes, )
March 8, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Instructions to Garnishee, #2 Notice of Garnishment, #3 Right to Claim Exemption, #4 Proposed Writ, #5 Answer of Garnishee Form)(bes, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Murphy-Thomas et al (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Alabama Middle Federal Defenders Program, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christi Murphy-Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Samantha R. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?