Hall v. Johnson & Johnson et al (MAG+)
Plaintiff: San Diego County Employees Retirement Association and Frank Hall
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson, Alex Gorsky, Dominic J. Caruso, Joan Casalvieri, Tara Glasgow and Carol Goodrich
Petitioner: Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles P.C. and Ted Meadows
Case Number: 2:2021mc03947
Filed: August 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
2 Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2021 Filing 19 REPLY in Support of #11 MOTION Under 45(f) to Transfer Plaintiffs' Motion to Quash filed by Johnson & Johnson. (Berdy, Christopher) Modified on 9/3/2021 to clarify text as reflected in pleading(am, ).
August 26, 2021 Filing 18 Supplemental Brief in Support of and Response to Defendant's #12 Opposition to #1 MOTION to Quash filed by Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles P.C., Ted Meadows. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lampkin, James) Modified on 8/26/2021 (am, ). Modified on 8/26/2021 to add linkage & clarify text as reflected in pleading (am, ).
August 26, 2021 Filing 17 Opposition to #11 MOTION to Transfer filed by Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles P.C., Ted Meadows. (Lampkin, James) Modified on 8/26/2021 to clarify text as reflected in pleading (am, ).
August 26, 2021 RESPONSE TO #14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles P.C., Ted Meadows. (NO PDF - See doc #17 ) (am, )
August 23, 2021 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. #4 Order mailed to Laurence M. Rosen returned by USPS with the following notation, "Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward." (dmn, ) (no pdf)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jack N. Frost. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 8/16/2021. (wcl, )
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kristen R. Seeger. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 8/16/2021. (wcl, )
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by the plfs in writing as to why the #11 Motion to Transfer should not be granted; Show Cause Response due by 8/26/2021; Dfts shall file a reply to the plfs' response on or before 9/2/2021; further ORDERED that the telephone oral argument set for 8/18/2021 is CANCELLED. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 8/16/2021. (furn: calendar, kr) (wcl, )
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: It is ORDERED that the above-styled action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 for further proceedings and determination or recommendation as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 8/16/2021. (am, )
August 13, 2021 RESPONSE TO #4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Johnson & Johnson. (NO PDF - See doc #12 ) (am, )
August 13, 2021 ***PURSUANT TO THE #10 MOTION - Attorney Kristen R. Seeger for Johnson & Johnson added. (NO PDF attached to this entry) (am, )
August 13, 2021 Filing 12 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Quash and Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1- Beasley Allen Press Release 02-07-2018, #3 Exhibit 2-Reuters Article 12-14-2018, #4 Exhibit 3-Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit 4-First Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit 5- Motion to Dismiss Opinion, #7 Exhibit 6-Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Cert., #8 Exhibit 7-Defendant's Sur-Reply in Further Opp to PS MF Class Cert, #9 Exhibit 8-Plaintiffs' Ltr re Sur-Reply, #10 Exhibit 9-Talc Containing Asbestos, #11 Exhibit 10- Ted Meadows Bio)(Berdy, Christopher)
August 13, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Transfer Plaintiffs' Motion to Quash under Rule 45(F) by Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1-Beasley Allen Subpoena Package, #3 Exhibit 2-Ted Meadows Subpoena Package, #4 Exhibit 3-Other Non-Party Subpoenas, #5 Exhibit 4-Joint Ltr to Judge re Non-Party Subpoena 08-09-2021, #6 Exhibit 5-First Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit 6-Order Appointing Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel, #8 Exhibit 7-Joint Application for Appointment of Steering Committee, #9 Exhibit 8-A. Lakind Ltr to Jack Frost 07-30-2021, #10 Exhibit 9-Motion to Dismiss Opinion 12-27-2019)(Berdy, Christopher) Modified on 8/16/2021 to clarify the docket text (wcl, ).
August 13, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission of Kristen R. Seeger Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $75.00 receipt number AALMDC-3072257.) by Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Berdy, Christopher) Modified on 8/13/2021 to add attorney's name & clarify docket text as reflected in pleading (am, ).
August 13, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission of Jack N. Frost, Jr. to Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $75.00 receipt number AALMDC-3072251.) by Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Berdy, Christopher) Modified on 8/13/2021 to add attorney name & delete 2nd motion event(am, ).
August 12, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kendall C. Dunson on behalf of Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles P.C., Ted Meadows (Dunson, Kendall)
August 11, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Johnson & Johnson re #6 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subsidiaries)(Berdy, Christopher)
August 10, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Johnson & Johnson; Corporate Disclosures due by 8/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order & Sample)(am, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles P.C., Ted Meadows re #2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Lampkin, James)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 8/13/2021, Dfts shall show cause in writing why the #1 motion to quash should not be granted; further ORDERED that this matter is set for oral argument by telephone on 8/18/2021 at 2:00 pm; The Courtroom Deputy is directed to provide the dial-in information to the parties; The parties are expected to join the call at least five minutes before the proceeding is scheduled to begin. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 8/9/2021. (Furn: Calendar, kr) (bes, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Sean Berdy on behalf of Johnson & Johnson (Berdy, Christopher)
August 9, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles P.C. & Ted Meadows; Corporate Disclosures due by 8/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order & Sample)(am, )
August 3, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to Quash Defendant's Subpoenas to Produce Documents Relating to Plaintiffs' Communications with Media Scources by Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles P.C., Ted Meadows. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Receipt)(am, )
August 3, 2021 Filing fee received: $49.00, receipt number 4602064187. (NO PDF - See doc #1 ) (am, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Johnson & Johnson et al (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Diego County Employees Retirement Association
Represented By: Donald A. Ecklund
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Kevin G. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Hall
Represented By: Laurence M. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Christopher Sean Berdy
Represented By: Jack N. Frost, Jr.
Represented By: Kristen R. Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Gorsky
Represented By: Jack N. Frost, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominic J. Caruso
Represented By: Jack N. Frost, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan Casalvieri
Represented By: Jack N. Frost, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara Glasgow
Represented By: Jack N. Frost, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Goodrich
Represented By: Jack N. Frost, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles P.C.
Represented By: Andy D. Birchfield, Jr.
Represented By: James Wayne Lampkin, II
Represented By: P. Leigh GAL O'Dell
Represented By: Kendall C. Dunson
Represented By: Patricia Leigh O'Dell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ted Meadows
Represented By: Andy D. Birchfield, Jr.
Represented By: James Wayne Lampkin, II
Represented By: P. Leigh GAL O'Dell
Represented By: Kendall C. Dunson
Represented By: Patricia Leigh O'Dell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?