Sinibaldi et al v. Jaddou et al (CONSENT)
Plaintiff: Luis Sinibaldi and The People Company, LLC
Defendant: Ur Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services and Merrick Garland
Case Number: 2:2022cv00021
Filed: January 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Office: Montgomery Office
Presiding Judge: Kelly F Pate
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER granting #21 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 3/3/2022. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Merrick Garland, Ur Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services re #22 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Bowdre, Marylou) Modified on 3/3/2022 to add the link to the #22 Notice (amf, ).
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Defendants Ur Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, & Merrick Garland; Corporate Disclosures due by 3/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time by Merrick Garland, Ur Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Bowdre, Marylou)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S #20 ORDER - Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate as presiding judge; Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins no longer assigned to the case. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: it is ORDERED that this action is REFERRED to the United States Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and to order the entry of a final judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Rule 73 of the FRCP. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 2/16/2022. (am, )
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Case transferred in from District of Maryland; Case Number 8:21-cv-02225. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Transfer Case; transferring this case to the USDC for the Middle District of Alabama; directing the clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 1/11/2022. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 1/13/2022.]
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 1/11/2022. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 1/13/2022.]
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to Judge Peter J. Messitte. Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 1/13/2022.]
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 12/14/2021. (heps, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 1/13/2022.]
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (DOCKETED IN ERROR) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: 13 Consent/Decline to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. Merrick Garland, Ur Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services or counsel for Merrick Garland, Ur Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services must correct the following error(s):**Signature is missing in the form; please sign and re-submit the Consent form. (heps, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 12/14/2021 (heps, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from mdd on 1/13/2022.]
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. Merrick Garland, Ur Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services or counsel for Merrick Garland, Ur Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 12/14/2021. (heps, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 1/13/2022.]
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Merrick Garland, Ur Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services.(Haven, Matthew) [Transferred from mdd on 1/13/2022.]
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 10/29/2021. (bc, Chambers) [Transferred from mdd on 1/13/2022.]
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Reply by Merrick Garland, Ur Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(Haven, Matthew) [Transferred from mdd on 1/13/2022.]
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Luis Sinibaldi, The People Company, LLC.(Joseph, Jeff) [Transferred from mdd on 1/13/2022.]
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Transfer Case by Merrick Garland, Ur Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Haven, Matthew) [Transferred from mdd on 1/13/2022.]
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (FILED IN ERROR BY COUNSEL) SUMMONS Returned Executed by The People Company, LLC, Luis Sinibaldi. All Defendants.(Joseph, Jeff) Modified on 9/16/2021 (heps, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from mdd on 1/13/2022.]
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 8/31/2021. (heps, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 1/13/2022.]
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. Luis Sinibaldi, The People Company, LLC or counsel for Luis Sinibaldi, The People Company, LLC are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 9/14/2021. (heps, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 1/13/2022.]
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued 60 days as to Merrick Garland, Ur Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(heps, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 1/13/2022.]
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9464869.), filed by The People Company, LLC, Luis Sinibaldi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exh 1 I-129 USCIS Decision, #3 Exhibit Exh 2 Original I-129 Approval, #4 Exhibit Exh 3 RFE Response Atty Cover Letter, #5 Exhibit Exh 4 Organizational Chart, #6 Exhibit Exh 5 RFE, #7 Exhibit Exh 6 RFE Response, #8 Exhibit Exh 7 Expanded Job Description, #9 Exhibit Exh 8 Calendar, #10 Exhibit Exh 9 Meeting Minutes, #11 Exhibit Exh 10 Work Product Emails, #12 Exhibit Exh 11 Petitioner Support Letter, #13 Exhibit Exh 12 Motion to Reopen, #14 Exhibit Exh 13 USCIS I-120B Decision, #15 Exhibit Exh 14 I-140 Approval Notice, #16 Summons Alejandro Mayorkas Summons, #17 Summons Civil Process Clerk Summons, #18 Summons Merrick Garland Summons, #19 Summons Ur Jaddou Summons, #20 Summons USCIS Summons)(Joseph, Jeff) [Transferred from mdd on 1/13/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sinibaldi et al v. Jaddou et al (CONSENT)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Sinibaldi
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The People Company, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur Jaddou
Represented By: Matthew A. Haven
Represented By: Marylou E. Bowdre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Matthew A. Haven
Represented By: Marylou E. Bowdre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Matthew A. Haven
Represented By: Marylou E. Bowdre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick Garland
Represented By: Matthew A. Haven
Represented By: Marylou E. Bowdre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?