Hand v. Athene Annuity and Life Co.
Plaintiff: Sarah L. Hand
Defendant: Athene Annuity and Life Co.
3Rd Party Defendant: Aimee R. Ordung, Jason S. Rehnberg and The Estate of Blair Fox Rehnberg
Case Number: 2:2022cv00354
Filed: June 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kelly F Pate
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2022 Filing 14 Third Party Summons Issued as to Aimee R. Ordung. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (bes, )
August 3, 2022 Filing 13 Proposed Summons (Alias Summons on a Third-Party Complaint for Aimee R. Ordung) (Burke, Emily)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Joint Motion to Stay Deadlines for Rule 16 and Rule 26 Obligations, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 7/14/2022. (bes, )
July 13, 2022 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines for Rule 16 and Rule 26 Obligations by Athene Annuity and Life Co.. (Burke, Emily)
July 11, 2022 Filing 10 Third-Party Summons Issued as to Aimee R. Ordung, Jason S. Rehnberg, The Estate of Blair Fox Rehnberg. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (bes, )
July 6, 2022 Filing 9 Proposed Third-Party Summons for Jason Scott Rehnberg, Aimee Ordung and Estate of Blair Fox Rehnberg (Burke, Emily) (Main Document 9 replaced on 7/11/2022 to attach a corrected PDF document to correct the type of form used; previously efiled version was a regular summons form rather than third party summons form.) (bes, ). Modified on 7/11/2022 (bes, ).
July 1, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Administrator ad Litem for the Estate of Blair Rehnberg by Athene Annuity and Life Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order A - Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Burke, Emily) Modified on 7/1/2022 to clarify text (cwl, ).
July 1, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Aimee R. Ordung, Jason S. Rehnberg, The Estate of Blair Fox Rehnberg, COUNTERCLAIM against Sarah L. Hand by Athene Annuity and Life Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25)(Burke, Emily) Modified on 7/1/2022 to correct the 3rd party def names (cwl, ).
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; The deadline for DFT to file their answer is extended to on or before 7/1/2022. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 6/16/2022. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, )
June 15, 2022 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Athene Annuity and Life Co.. (Burke, Emily)
June 10, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (ALL PARTIES) Athene Annuity and Life Co., Sarah L. Hand. (bes, )
June 10, 2022 Filing 3 Case assigned to Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate as presiding judge. (bes, )
June 10, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Athene Annuity and Life Company. (Hess, Joshua)
June 10, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Athene Annuity and Life Co. from Circuit Court for Elmore County, Alabama, case number 29-CV-2022-900094.00. ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AALMDC-3236335) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hess, Joshua) Modified on 6/10/2022 to correct spelling of DFT name (bes, ).
June 10, 2022 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Athene Annuity and Life Co., filed by Sarah L. Hand. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 for PDF)(bes, ) Modified on 6/10/2022 to include jury demand (bes, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hand v. Athene Annuity and Life Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah L. Hand
Represented By: John David Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Athene Annuity and Life Co.
Represented By: Emily C. Burke
Represented By: James Ethan McDaniel
Represented By: Joshua Robert Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Aimee R. Ordung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Jason S. Rehnberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: The Estate of Blair Fox Rehnberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?