Bosarge et al v. United States Department of the Treasury et al
Plaintiff: Patrick Charest, Clifford Ellis, Robert George, Justin Hicks, Jonathan Hill, Antwan Lambert, Darryl Montgomery, Arlando Nichols, Demetrius Poe, William Roache, Eric Thomas, Kenneth Traywick, Willie Turner, Raymond Bosarge, Brandon Carter and Rodney Lee Lindsay
Defendant: United States Department of the Treasury, Janet L. Yellen, Kay E. Ivey, John Q. Hamm, Bill Poole, Steve Clouse, Greg Albritton, Bobby Singleton, Cam Ward, Young Boozer, Alabama Department of Corrections, Alabama Corrections Institution Finance Authority, Caddell Construction Co. (DE), LLC and W.S. Newell & Sons, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv00407
Filed: July 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 4321 Review of Agency Action-Environment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER: It is ORDERED that the Non-Federal Defendants' Joint Unopposed Motion to Set Pleading Response Schedule (Doc. #5 ) is GRANTED and that the deadline for all Defendants to file responses to the Complaint is sixty days after the date Plaintiffs effect service on the Federal Defendants. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 8/22/2022. (dmn, ) (no pdf)
August 12, 2022 Filing 16 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Young Boozer. (Buck, Thomas)
August 12, 2022 Filing 15 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Cam Ward. (Buck, Thomas)
August 12, 2022 Filing 14 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Bobby Singleton. (Buck, Thomas)
August 12, 2022 Filing 13 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Greg Albritton. (Buck, Thomas)
August 12, 2022 Filing 12 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Steve Clouse. (Buck, Thomas)
August 12, 2022 Filing 11 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Bill Poole. (Buck, Thomas)
August 12, 2022 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by John Q. Hamm. (Buck, Thomas)
August 12, 2022 Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Kay E. Ivey. (Buck, Thomas)
August 12, 2022 Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Alabama Corrections Institution Finance Authority. (Buck, Thomas)
August 12, 2022 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Alabama Department of Corrections. (Buck, Thomas)
August 11, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Winchester Hend Buck, Jr on behalf of Alabama Corrections Institution Finance Authority, Alabama Department of Corrections, Greg Albritton, Young Boozer, Steve Clouse, John Q. Hamm, Kay E. Ivey, Bill Poole, Bobby Singleton, Cam Ward (Buck, Thomas)
August 10, 2022 Filing 5 Joint MOTION To Set Pleading Response Schedule by Alabama Corrections Institution Finance Authority, Alabama Department of Corrections, Greg Albritton, Young Boozer, Steve Clouse, John Q. Hamm, Kay E. Ivey, Bill Poole, Bobby Singleton, Cam Ward. (Williams, Christopher)
July 14, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Alabama Corrections Institution Finance Authority, Alabama Department of Corrections, Greg Albritton, Young Boozer, Caddell Construction Co. (DE), LLC, Steve Clouse, John Q. Hamm, Kay E. Ivey, Bill Poole, Bobby Singleton, United States Department of the Treasury, W.S. Newell & Sons, Inc., Cam Ward, Janet L. Yellen, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General; Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service (bes, )
July 11, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons for all Defendants (Sawyer, Kyle) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/14/2022 to correct summons) (bes, ). Modified on 7/14/2022 (bes, ).
July 11, 2022 Filing 2 Case assigned to Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins as presiding judge and Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle as referral judge. (bes, )
July 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Department of the Treasury, Janet L. Yellen, Kay E. Ivey, John Q. Hamm, Bill Poole, Steve Clouse, Greg Albritton, Bobby Singleton, Cam Ward, Young Boozer, Alabama Department of Corrections, Alabama Corrections Institution Finance Authority, Caddell Construction Co. (DE), LLC, W.S. Newell & Sons, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AALMDC-3252843.), filed by Patrick Charest, Chifford Ellis, Robert George, Justin Hicks, Jonathan Hill, Antwan Lambert, Darryl Montgomery, Arlando Nichols, Demetrius Poe, William Roache, Eric Thomas, Kenneth Traywick, Willie Turner. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 10/11/2022. (EXHIBIT 1 CONTAINED WITHIN MAIN DOC PDF) (Sawyer, Kyle) Modified on 7/11/2022 to clarify the docket text (bes, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/11/2022: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bes, ).
July 11, 2022 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Raymond Bosarge, Brandon Carter, Patrick Charest, Clifford Ellis, Robert George, Justin Hicks, Jonathan Hill, Antwan Lambert, Rodney Lee Lindsay, Darryl Montgomery, Arlando Nichols, Demetrius Poe, William Roache, Eric Thomas, Kenneth Traywick, Willie Turner. (No PDF attached to this entry - see Doc entry #1 (Exhibit 1) for PDF) (bes, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bosarge et al v. United States Department of the Treasury et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Charest
Represented By: Kyle David Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Ellis
Represented By: Kyle David Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert George
Represented By: Kyle David Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Hicks
Represented By: Kyle David Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Hill
Represented By: Kyle David Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antwan Lambert
Represented By: Kyle David Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Montgomery
Represented By: Kyle David Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlando Nichols
Represented By: Kyle David Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrius Poe
Represented By: Kyle David Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Roache
Represented By: Kyle David Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Thomas
Represented By: Kyle David Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Traywick
Represented By: Kyle David Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Turner
Represented By: Kyle David Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Bosarge
Represented By: Kyle David Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Carter
Represented By: Kyle David Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Lee Lindsay
Represented By: Kyle David Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet L. Yellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay E. Ivey
Represented By: Christopher James Williams
Represented By: Thomas Winchester Hend Buck, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Q. Hamm
Represented By: Christopher James Williams
Represented By: Thomas Winchester Hend Buck, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Poole
Represented By: Christopher James Williams
Represented By: Thomas Winchester Hend Buck, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Clouse
Represented By: Christopher James Williams
Represented By: Thomas Winchester Hend Buck, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Albritton
Represented By: Thomas Winchester Hend Buck, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher James Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Singleton
Represented By: Christopher James Williams
Represented By: Thomas Winchester Hend Buck, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cam Ward
Represented By: Christopher James Williams
Represented By: Thomas Winchester Hend Buck, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young Boozer
Represented By: Christopher James Williams
Represented By: Thomas Winchester Hend Buck, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections
Represented By: Christopher James Williams
Represented By: Thomas Winchester Hend Buck, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Corrections Institution Finance Authority
Represented By: Christopher James Williams
Represented By: Thomas Winchester Hend Buck, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caddell Construction Co. (DE), LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.S. Newell & Sons, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?