Bradley et al v. Big's Trucking et al
Plaintiff: Desmond Bradley, Andrea Thomas, Paul C. Harris and Brian Buerkle
Defendant: Big's Trucking, Ricky Gray, Pamela Tarter, Jeffrey Tarter, Outlaw Express, LLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation and Commerical Express, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2023cv00122
Filed: March 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/25/2024 in Montgomery, AL before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson; Non-Jury Trial set for 6/17/2024 in Montgomery, AL before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson; Dispositive & Daubert Motions due by 12/27/2023; Mediation Notice due by 12/4/2023; Amended Pleadings due by 7/10/2023; Discovery due by 11/27/2023, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 4/24/2023. (Furn: Calendar, ag) (bes, )
April 17, 2023 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Saunders, Anna)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Rule 26(f) ORDER: DIRECTING that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable but not later than 5/1/2023, as further set out in Order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 4/10/2023. (am, )
April 6, 2023 Filing 5 (Amended Notice of Removal) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal,,,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I Brian Lipford Declaration, #2 Exhibit J Commercial Express Annual Report, #3 Exhibit K Big's Trucking DOT Authorization, #4 Exhibit L Brian Lipford evidence of residency, #5 Exhibit M Kassie Lipford evidence of residency, #6 Exhibit N Pamela Tarter evidence of residency, #7 Exhibit O Jeffrey Tarter evidence of residency)(Saunders, Anna) Modified on 4/6/2023 (bes, ).
April 6, 2023 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation from Circuit Court of Lowndes County, AL, case number 45-CV-22-900014.00. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #5 for PDF - counsel selected incorrect event code during filing)(bes, )
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: It is therefore the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that the removing defendant has until 4/6/2023, to amend the notice of removal to allege jurisdiction sufficiently, see 28 USC 1653; otherwise this lawsuit shall be remanded to state court. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 3/23/2023. (bes, )
March 2, 2023 Filing 3 Case assigned to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson as Presiding Judge and Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams as Referral Judge. (bes, )
March 2, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Saunders, Anna)
March 2, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation from Lowndes County Circuit Court, case number 45-CV-2022-900014.00. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AALMDC-3385538) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A State Court Pt. 1, #3 Exhibit A State Court Pt. 2, #4 Exhibit A State Court Pt. 3, #5 Exhibit B Third Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit C Plaintiff's Email, #7 Exhibit D ALEA THI Excerpt, #8 Exhibit E Consent to Removal, #9 Exhibit F Return on Service, #10 Exhibit G Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #11 Exhibit H Go Fund Me Page)(Saunders, Anna) Modified on 3/2/2023 to clarify the docket text (bes, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/6/2023 to redact personal information contained in original filing pursuant to the E-government rules: #12 Ex. A State Court Record Pt 1 (REDACTED), #13 Ex A State Court Record Pt 2 (REDACTED), #14 Ex A State Court Record Pt 3 (REDACTED), #15 Ex D (REDACTED)) (bes, ). Modified on 3/6/2023 (bes, ).
March 2, 2023 Written Consent to the #1 Notice of Removal by Ricky Gray. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 -8 for PDF)(bes, )
March 2, 2023 NOTICE of Filing #1 Notice of Removal with the Circuit Court of Lowndes County, AL by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 -10 for PDF)(bes, )
March 2, 2023 ANSWER to Third Amended Complaint, by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 -4 at page 192 for PDF)(bes, )
March 2, 2023 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Big's Trucking, Commerical Express, Inc., Ricky Gray, Outlaw Express, LLC, Jeffrey Tarter, Pamela Tarter, filed by Desmond Bradley, Andrea Thomas, Brian Buerkle, Paul C. Harris. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 -4 at page 118 for PDF)(bes, )
March 2, 2023 ANSWER to Complaint by GEICO Casualty Insurance Company. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 -2 at page 109 for PDF)(bes, )
March 2, 2023 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Big's Trucking, Ricky Gray, GEICO Casualty Insurance Company, Outlaw Express, LLC, filed by Desmond Bradley, Andrea Thomas. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 -2 at page 65 for PDF)(bes, )
March 2, 2023 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Big's Trucking, Ricky Gray, GEICO Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Desmond Bradley, Andrea Thomas. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 -2 at page 3 for PDF)(bes, )
March 2, 2023 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Big's Trucking, Commerical Express, Inc., Ricky Gray, Outlaw Express, LLC, Jeffrey Tarter, Pamela Tarter, filed by Desmond Bradley, Andrea Thomas, Paul C. Harris. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 -3 at page 59 for PDF)(bes, )
March 2, 2023 ANSWER with JURY DEMAND to Complaint by Ricky Gray. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 -3 at page 93 for PDF)(bes, )
March 2, 2023 ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint, by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 -4 at page 102 for PDF)(bes, )
March 2, 2023 ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint, by Ricky Gray. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 -4 at page 20 for PDF)(bes, )
March 2, 2023 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint, by Ricky Gray. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 -4 at page 9 for PDF)(bes, )
March 2, 2023 ANSWER to Third Amended Complaint, by Ricky Gray. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 -4 at page 160 for PDF)(bes, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradley et al v. Big's Trucking et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desmond Bradley
Represented By: Brett W. Aaron
Represented By: Rickman Edgar Williams, III
Represented By: Andrew Ted Citrin
Represented By: William Bradford Kittrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Thomas
Represented By: Andrew Ted Citrin
Represented By: Rickman Edgar Williams, III
Represented By: William Bradford Kittrell
Represented By: Brett W. Aaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul C. Harris
Represented By: Brett W. Aaron
Represented By: Rickman Edgar Williams, III
Represented By: Andrew Ted Citrin
Represented By: William Bradford Kittrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Buerkle
Represented By: Rickman Edgar Williams, III
Represented By: Brett W. Aaron
Represented By: Andrew Ted Citrin
Represented By: William Bradford Kittrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big's Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Gray
Represented By: Eric David Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Tarter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Tarter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Outlaw Express, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Young
Represented By: Anna Cerise Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commerical Express, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?