Aaron v. Ferrell
Plaintiff: Lakeshia Aaron
Defendant: Teresa L. Ferrell
Case Number: 2:2023cv00374
Filed: June 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Chad W Bryan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 6851 Disclosure of Intimate Images
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lakeshia Aaron. Teresa L. Ferrell served on 7/11/2023, answer due 8/1/2023. (Weeks, Joseph)
June 29, 2023 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Lakeshia Aaron re #4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Weeks, Joseph) Modified on 6/29/2023 to add link (bes, ).
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joseph W. Weeks. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chad W. Bryan on 6/13/2023. (no pdf attached) (cwl, )
June 13, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Teresa L. Ferrell.NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (bes, )
June 13, 2023 Filing 4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Lakeshia Aaron; Corporate Disclosures due by 6/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(bes, )
June 13, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (PLF) Lakeshia Aaron. (bes, )
June 9, 2023 Filing 2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joseph W. Weeks (Receipt Number 2445, Filing fee $ 75.00) by Lakeshia Aaron. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Receipt, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(bes, )
June 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Teresa L. Ferrell (Receipt Number 2444, Filing fee $ 402.00), filed by Lakeshia Aaron. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 9/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(bes, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/20/2023: #3 Civil Cover Sheet (Signed), #4 Corrected Signature Pages) (bes, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aaron v. Ferrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakeshia Aaron
Represented By: Joseph W. Weeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa L. Ferrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?