Jerido v. Fidelity and Deposit Company (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: Antonio Orlander Jerido
Defendant: Fidelity and Deposit Company
Case Number: 2:2023cv00409
Filed: July 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Drop a Party and MOTION for Discovery by Antonio Orlander Jerido. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (hrr, )
July 26, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend and Correct Inmate 1983 Complaint by Antonio Orlander Jerido. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint)(am, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2023: #2 Main Signature Page & (3) Amended Complaint Original Signature Pages) (am, ).
July 21, 2023 Filing 6 AO FORM 85 sent to counsel for Fidelity and Deposit Company. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: If the parties wish to consent to the jurisdiction of a US Magistrate Judge, counsel is required to print, sign and mail this form to all parties/counsel in this case. This form should not be returned to the Clerk's Office unless all parties have consented. (cwl, )
July 21, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Fidelity and Deposit Company.(Burrow, Nathan) Modified on 7/21/2023 to clarify text (cwl, ).
July 17, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Amend Inmate 1983 Complaint by Antonio Orlander Jerido. (am, )
July 6, 2023 Filing 3 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson as Presiding Judge and Magistrate Judge Jerusha T. Adams as Referral Judge. (bes, )
July 6, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Fidelity and Deposit Company. (Burrow, Nathan) Modified on 7/6/2023 to clarify name of filing party (bes, ).
July 6, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Fidelity and Deposit Company from the Circuit Court of Elmore County, AL, case number 29-CV-2023-000054.00. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AALMDC-3464055) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit B - Jerido arrest warrant (SEALED, PRIVACY ISSUE))(Burrow, Nathan) Modified on 7/6/2023 to clarify text (bes, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/6/2023 to redact personal information contained in original filing pursuant to the E-government rules: #4 Exhibit B - Jerido arrest warrant (REDACTED VERSION)) (bes, ). Modified on 7/6/2023 (bes,
July 6, 2023 MOTION to Amend by Antonio Orlander Jerido. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 -2 at page 23 for PDF) (bes, )
July 6, 2023 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Fidelity and Deposit Company, filed by Antonio Orlander Jerido. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 -2 at page 2 for PDF)(bes, )
July 6, 2023 MOTION for Disciplinary Action and Removal from Office by Antonio Orlander Jerido. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 -2 at page 8 for PDF) (bes, )
July 6, 2023 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Antonio Orlander Jerido. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 -2 at page 15 for PDF) (bes, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jerido v. Fidelity and Deposit Company (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Orlander Jerido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity and Deposit Company
Represented By: Nathan L. Burrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?