Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. Thomason (MAG+)
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Defendant: Steven Clayton Thomason
Intervenor Defendant: Bre Leonna Thomason
Case Number: 2:2023cv00543
Filed: September 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Chad W Bryan
Referring Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345 Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Set Aside the Non-Judicial Foreclosure Under Service Members Civil Relief Act (SCRA) by Steven Clayton Thomason. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(bes, )
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ("Supplemental Motion to Deny Remand") re #11 Order to Show Cause, filed by Steven Clayton Thomason. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(cwl, )
October 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ("Motion to Deny Remand") re #11 Order to Show Cause, filed by Steven Clayton Thomason. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(cwl, )
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Return Receipt Card showing service of #11 Order to Show Cause, signed by C. Thomason for: Steven Clayton Thomason and Bre Leonna Thomason served on 10/13/2023. (WCL)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Upon the court's preliminary review of the pending Motion to Remand (Doc. #4 ), it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant Thomason show cause on or before October 26, 2023 as to why this action should not be remanded to the Circuit Court of Montgomery County, Alabama-including, but not limited to, on grounds of untimely removal and lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chad W. Bryan on 10/12/2023. (mailed regular mail & CMRRR to pro se defs)(cwl, )
October 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Deny Remand and MOTION for Summary Judgment of Counterclaim/Complaint & Dismissal of Deutsche Bank Complaint Under Military Protections by Steven Clayton Thomason. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(cwl, )
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Intervene as Right of Federal Rule 24(a) by Bre Leonna Thomason. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(cwl, )
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION Under 50 USC 3955 app. 521.B522 and 524, Section 521 of the SCRA the Service Members Civil Relief Act for 90-day Delay, or MOTION to Stay in the Proceeding by Steven Clayton Thomason. (cwl, )
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Steven Clayton Thomason re #2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (cwl, )
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company re #5 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Bottcher, Christopher) Modified on 9/26/2023 to add link (cwl, ).
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. Corporate Disclosures due by 10/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(cwl, )
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mullen, Jon-Kaden)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 to the United States Magistrate Judge for all pretrial proceedings and entry of any orders or recommendations as may be appropriate. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 9/18/2023. (cwl, )
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Defendant Steven Clayton Thomason; Corporate Disclosures due by 9/25/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(amf, )
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, AL, case number 03-CV-2023-900827.00. ( Filing fee $ 402, Receipt # 3130) , filed by Steven Clayton Thomason. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Alias Complaint, #3 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #4 Filing Fee Receipt)(amf, )
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order COMPLAINT against Steven Clayton Thomason, filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 - 1 for PDF)(amf, )
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order ALIAS COMPLAINT against Steven Clayton Thomason, filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 - 2 for PDF)(amf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. Thomason (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Christopher Allen Bottcher
Represented By: Jon-Kaden Gutherie Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Clayton Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Bre Leonna Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?