Ramey v. Fair et al (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: Abraham Ramey
Defendant: Officer Fair and John Crow
Case Number: 2:2023cv00581
Filed: October 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Charles S Coody
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2023 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Abraham Ramey re #4 Application. (dmn, )
October 18, 2023 Filing 4 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Abraham Ramey. (dmn, )
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: it is ORDERED that, on or before 10/18/2023, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $52.00 administrative fee or file an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis with a prison account statement, as further set out in order; DIRECTING the Clerk to (1) provide Plaintiff with an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and (2) provide a copy of this Order to the inmate account clerk at the facility where Plaintiff is detained. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/4/2023. (Furnished: Cashier) (IFP form mailed as directed) (Copy mailed to account clerk at Kilby CF as directed)(amf, )
October 2, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Abraham Ramey. (hrr, )
October 2, 2023 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against John Crow, Officer Fair, filed by Abraham Ramey. (NO IFP; NO FILING FEE)(hrr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramey v. Fair et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abraham Ramey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Fair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?