Axle Box Innovations, LLC et al v. Bullock et al
Plaintiff: Axle Box Innovations, LLC and Tracks North America, Inc.
Defendant: Walter Bullock, Daniel C Pose, Gulf Coast Wolverine, LLC and Daniel C. Pose
Case Number: 2:2023cv00602
Filed: October 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Referring Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2023 Filing 21 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #19 Order to Show Cause, filed by Axle Box Innovations, LLC, Tracks North America, Inc.. (Holt, Padon)
November 22, 2023 Filing 20 Defendant Walter Bullock's First Amended ANSWER with JURY DEMAND and COUNTERCLAIM against Axle Box Innovations, LLC, Tracks North America, Inc. by Walter Bullock.(Mills, Wallace) Modified on 11/22/2023 to clarify text (bes, ).
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: it is ORDERED that, on or before December 8, 2023, the Plaintiff shall show cause why Defendants Daniel C. Pose and Gulf Coast Wolverine, LLC should not be dismissed for want of prosecution. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 11/17/2023. (cwl, )
November 7, 2023 Filing 18 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Walter Bullock. (Mills, Wallace)
November 6, 2023 Filing 17 ANSWER with JURY DEMAND to #16 Amended Complaint, by Walter Bullock.(Mills, Wallace) Modified on 11/7/2023 to reflect Jury Demand (bes, ).
October 24, 2023 Filing 16 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Walter Bullock, Daniel C. Pose, Gulf Coast Wolverine, LLC, filed by Axle Box Innovations, LLC, Tracks North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Holt, Padon) Modified on 10/24/2023 to clarify text, and reflect PLFs and DFTs (bes, ).
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Plfs shall amend their Complaint to sufficiently allege jurisdiction; Amended Pleadings due by 10/31/2023. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 10/24/2023. (bes, )
October 23, 2023 Filing 14 Amended Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Axle Box Innovations, LLC, Tracks North America, Inc. re #9 Order, (Holt, Padon) Modified on 10/23/2023 to clarify as amended (cwl, ).
October 20, 2023 Filing 13 Return Receipt Card showing service of Gulf Coast Wolverine, LLC signed by Daniel Pose for Gulf Coast Wolverine, LLC served on 10/16/2023, answer due 11/6/2023. (McNeill, James)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Attorney Padon D. Holt to Appear Pro Hac Vice and Attorney Padon D. Holt is ADMITTED to appear before this Court pro hac vice to represent the Plfs in this action. Attorney Holt shall file a notice of appearance with the Court. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 10/20/2023. (bes, )
October 18, 2023 Filing 11 Return Receipt Card showing service of Daniel C. Pose signed by Daniel Pose for Daniel C. Pose served on 10/16/2023, answer due 11/6/2023. (McNeill, James)
October 17, 2023 Filing 10 Return Receipt Card showing service of Walter Bullock signed by W Bullock for Walter Bullock served on 10/14/2023, answer due 11/6/2023. (McNeill, James)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Plfs shall file a conflict disclosure statement which complies with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Orders of this Court on or before 10/24/2023. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 10/17/2023. (bes, )
October 16, 2023 Filing 8 Case reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks. Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (dmn, )
October 12, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Walter Bullock, Gulf Coast Wolverine, LLC, Daniel C. Pose. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (bes, )
October 12, 2023 Filing 6 Proposed Summons to Bullock, Pose, and Gulf Coast Wolverine, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons)(McNeill, James)
October 12, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE to Counsel re Service Material. (bes, )
October 12, 2023 Filing 4 Case assigned to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson as Presiding Judge and Magistrate Judge Jerusha T. Adams as Referral Judge. (bes, )
October 11, 2023 Filing 3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Padon D. Holt ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number AALMDC-3519413.) by Axle Box Innovations, LLC, Tracks North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(McNeill, James) Modified on 10/11/2023 to reflect requesting atty (bes, ).
October 11, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Axle Box Innovations, LLC, Tracks North America, Inc.. (McNeill, James)
October 11, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Walter Bullock, Gulf Coast Wolverine, LLC, Daniel C. Pose ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AALMDC-3519347.), filed by Axle Box Innovations, LLC, Tracks North America, Inc.. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 1/9/2024. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McNeill, James) Modified on 10/11/2023 to clarify text (bes, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Axle Box Innovations, LLC et al v. Bullock et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Axle Box Innovations, LLC
Represented By: James Randall McNeill
Represented By: Padon David Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracks North America, Inc.
Represented By: James Randall McNeill
Represented By: Padon David Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Bullock
Represented By: Wallace Damon Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel C Pose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Coast Wolverine, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel C. Pose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?