Lyons v. Walmart, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Carol P Lyons and Carol P. Lyons
Defendant: Walmart, Inc., Green Dot Corporation and Green Dot Bank doing business as Bonneville Bank
Case Number: 2:2023cv00616
Filed: October 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Emily C Marks
Referring Judge: Kelly F Pate
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2023 Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Amended Complaint, by Walmart, Inc.. (Beers, Michael)
December 18, 2023 Filing 25 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Amended Complaint, Unopposed by Green Dot Bank, Green Dot Corporation. (Manley, Reid)
November 30, 2023 Filing 24 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Walmart, Inc. re #22 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Mathis, Alan) Modified on 11/30/2023 to add link (cwl, ).
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Deadline To Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 11/20/2023. (no pdf attached) (cwl, )
November 20, 2023 Filing 22 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Walmart, Inc. Corporate Disclosures due by 11/30/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(cwl, )
November 20, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Deadline To Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint re #8 Amended Complaint, by Walmart, Inc. (Mathis, Alan) Modified on 11/20/2023 to correct motion event (cwl, ).
November 20, 2023 ***PURSUANT TO #21 - Attorney Michael Baird Beers, Xan Peyton Ingram for Walmart, Inc. added. (no pdf attached) (cwl, )
November 17, 2023 Filing 20 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Green Dot Corporation re #18 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Manley, Reid)
November 17, 2023 Filing 19 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Green Dot Bank re #18 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Manley, Reid)
November 15, 2023 Filing 18 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Green Dot Corporation, Green Dot Bank. Corporate Disclosures due by 11/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(cwl, )
November 14, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Eric Gottlieb on behalf of Green Dot Bank, Green Dot Corporation (Gottlieb, Richard)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 11/8/2023. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, )
November 8, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Amended Complaint, (Unopposed) by Green Dot Bank, Green Dot Corporation. (Manley, Reid)
November 8, 2023 Filing 14 Return Receipt Card showing service of Complaint signed by C. Segrest for Walmart, Inc. served on 11/3/2023, answer due 11/24/2023. (Gipson, Courtney)
November 8, 2023 Filing 13 Return Receipt Card showing service of Complaint signed by Rylie Greenfield for Green Dot Bank served on 11/2/2023, answer due 11/24/2023. (Gipson, Courtney)
November 8, 2023 Filing 12 Return Receipt Card showing service of Complaint signed by Kelly Webster for Green Dot Corporation served on 10/30/2023, answer due 11/20/2023. (Gipson, Courtney)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Now pending before the Court is counsel for Defendant Green Dot Corporation and Green Dot Bank's motion to admit Richard E. Gottlieb pro hac vice. (Doc. #10 ). Upon consideration of the motion, and for good cause, it is ORDERED that the motion to admit pro hac vice (doc. #10 ) is GRANTED, and Attorney Richard E. Gottlieb is ADMITTED to appear before this Court pro hac vice to represent Green Dot. Attorney Gottlieb shall file a notice of appearance with this Court. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 11/8/2023. (dmn, )
November 7, 2023 Filing 10 Motion for Richard E. Gottlieb to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number AALMDC-3534132.) by Green Dot Bank, Green Dot Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Manley, Reid) Modified on 11/7/2023 to add atty's name to text (cwl, ).
November 7, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Reid Stephens Manley on behalf of Green Dot Bank, Green Dot Corporation (Manley, Reid)
November 7, 2023 ***PURSUANT TO #10 - Attorney Richard Eric Gottlieb for Green Dot Bank, Green Dot Corporation added. (no pdf attached) (cwl, )
October 30, 2023 Filing 8 AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Walmart, Inc., Green Dot Corporation, Green Dot Bank, filed by Carol P. Lyons. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Receipt, #2 Exhibit 2 - Pre-Suit Notice (Redacted)(Gipson, Courtney) Modified on 10/30/2023 to add jury demand & def names (cwl, ).
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before 10/31/2023, the Plf shall amend her complaint to sufficiently allege jurisdiction and clarify the citizenship of Green Dot Bank. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 10/24/2023. (bes, )
October 20, 2023 Filing 6 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks as presiding judge; Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (WCL)
October 20, 2023 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Carol P Lyons re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Gipson, Courtney)
October 20, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Green Dot Bank, Green Dot Corporation, Walmart, Inc. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cwl, )
October 20, 2023 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Carol P. Lyons. Corporate Disclosures due by 10/30/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(cwl, )
October 20, 2023 Filing 2 Case Assigned to Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr as presiding Judge and Magistrate Judge Kelly F. Pate as referral Judge. (cwl, )
October 20, 2023 Filing 1 Class Action COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Walmart, Inc., Green Dot Corporation, Green Dot Bank ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AALMDC-3524556.), filed by Carol P. Lyons. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 1/18/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Receipt, #2 Exhibit 2 - Pre-suit Notice (Redacted), #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons to Walmart, Inc. #5 Proposed Summons to Green Dot Corporation, #6 Proposed Summons to Green Dot Bank d/b/a Bonneville Bank)(Gipson, Courtney) Modified on 10/20/2023 to add jury demand, def names and to clarify text (cwl, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lyons v. Walmart, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol P Lyons
Represented By: James Matthew Stephens
Represented By: John Livingston Adams
Represented By: Courtney Cooper Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol P. Lyons
Represented By: Courtney Cooper Gipson
Represented By: James Matthew Stephens
Represented By: John Livingston Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Alan Daniel Mathis
Represented By: Michael Baird Beers
Represented By: Xan Peyton Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Dot Corporation
Represented By: Richard Eric Gottlieb
Represented By: Reid Stephens Manley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Dot Bank doing business as Bonneville Bank
Represented By: Reid Stephens Manley
Represented By: Richard Eric Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?