Sullen v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cynthia Sullen
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv00676
Filed: November 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Chad W Bryan
Referring Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2024 Filing 32 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Cynthia Sullen re #28 SECOND Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Elliott, John) Modified on 1/18/2024 to add link to notice (BES).
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the #29 motion is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 1/8/2024. (AM)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Plaintiff shall file a response to the Defendants' #26 motion on or before 1/29/2024; It is further ORDERED that the Defendants shall file a reply to the Plaintiff's response on or before 2/5/2024. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 1/8/2024. (AM)
January 8, 2024 Filing 29 MOTION to Stay Deadlines by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Yearout, Christopher) Modified on 1/8/2024 to clarify text (CWL).
January 8, 2024 Filing 28 SECOND Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Cynthia Sullen. Corporate Disclosures due by 1/18/2024. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(CWL)
January 8, 2024 Filing 27 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #26 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hearing Transcript) (Yearout, Christopher)
January 8, 2024 Filing 26 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Yearout, Christopher)
January 3, 2024 Filing 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Emily C. Marks: Status Conference held on 1/3/2024 (PDF available for court use only). (Court Reporter Dee Coker, 334-799-1573, Dee_Coker@almd.uscourts.gov.) (CS)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the #22 motion to admit pro hac vice is GRANTED, and Attorney John Christopher Elliott is ADMITTED to appear before this Court pro hac vice to represent Cynthia Sullen. Attorney Elliott shall file a notice of appearance with the Court. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 12/21/2023. (BES)
December 20, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Paul Gramling on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Gramling, Christopher)
December 20, 2023 Filing 22 Motion for John Christopher Elliott to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number AALMDC-3555386.) by Cynthia Sullen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Bross, William) Modified on 12/20/2023 to add atty's name (cwl, ).
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the #19 motion to admit pro hac vice is GRANTED, and Attorney Christopher P. Gramling is ADMITTED to appear before this Court pro hac vice to represent Sanofi. Attorney Gramling shall file a notice of appearance with the Court. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 12/14/2023. (bes, )
December 13, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by William Louis McKinney Bross, IV on behalf of Cynthia Sullen (Bross, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/14/2023: #1 Corrected Certificate of Service) (BES).
December 12, 2023 Filing 19 Motion for Christopher Paul Gramling to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number AALMDC-3550987.) by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Yearout, Christopher) Modified on 12/12/2023 to add atty's name to text (cwl, ).
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: it is ORDERED that this matter is SET for a status conference on January 3, 2024, at 10:30 a.m. CST by telephone conference call. The parties are DIRECTED to contact Courtroom Deputy Cindy Sanders for the phone number and access code required to participate in the conference call. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to provide a court reporter for this proceeding. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 12/11/2023. (furn: calendar, cs, lw)(cwl, )
November 30, 2023 Filing 17 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC re #13 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Dunn, W.)
November 30, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by W. McKinley Dunn on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Dunn, W.)
November 30, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher C. Yearout on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Yearout, Christopher)
November 21, 2023 Filing 14 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Cynthia Sullen. Corporate Disclosures due by 12/1/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(cwl, )
November 21, 2023 Filing 13 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Sanofi US Services Inc.; Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Corporate Disclosures due by 12/1/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(cwl, )
November 20, 2023 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:16-cv-17106. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TRANSFER ORDER-Case transferred to Middle District of Alabama. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (MDL 2740, Doc. 16511) (go) [Transferred from laed on 11/21/2023.]
September 28, 2023 Filing 10 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Joint Designation of General and Case-Specified MDL Records to Be Included Upon Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Byard, Adrienne) [Transferred from laed on 11/21/2023.]
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI) [Transferred from laed on 11/21/2023.]
May 16, 2017 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Hospira, Inc., Sanofi S.A., Sanofi US Services Inc.. (Payton, Paige) [Transferred from laed on 11/21/2023.]
May 14, 2017 Filing 7 AMENDED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND by Cynthia Sullen. Party Sanofi S.A., Sanofi US Services Inc. and Hospira, Inc. added. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Bachus, Jere) Modified text on 5/15/2017 (tm).[Transferred from laed on 11/21/2023.] Modified on 11/21/2023 to add jury demand (cwl, ).
January 10, 2017 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Accord Healthcare, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Apotex Inc., Aventis Pharma S.A., Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Northstar RX, LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Sandoz Inc., Sanofi S.A., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sun Pharma Global, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons)(tm) [Transferred from laed on 11/21/2023.]
January 9, 2017 Filing 5 Request of Summons Issued as to Accord Healthcare, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Apotex Inc., Aventis Pharma S.A., Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Northstar RX, LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Sandoz Inc., Sanofi S.A., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sun Pharma Global, Inc. filed by Cynthia Sullen re #1 Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons)(Bachus, Jere) [Transferred from laed on 11/21/2023.]
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL ORDER #1-6. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) [Transferred from laed on 11/21/2023.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint - Filing attorney incorrectly indexed party name - 'Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC'. When entering a party name, only the name of the party should be indexed. Any aliases should be added to the named party with the appropriate alias party role. Clerk took corrective action. (tm) [Transferred from laed on 11/21/2023.]
December 14, 2016 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (am) [Transferred from laed on 11/21/2023.]
December 12, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Accord Healthcare, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Apotex Inc., Aventis Pharma S.A., Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, Inc., McKesson Packaging, Northstar RX, LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Sandoz Inc., Sanofi S.A., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, separately and d/b/a Winthrop U.S., Sun Pharma Global, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-5849173) filed by Cynthia Sullen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Jere Kyle Bachus added to party Cynthia Sullen(pty:pla).(Bachus, Jere) [Transferred from laed on 11/21/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullen v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Paul Gramling
Represented By: Christopher C. Yearout
Represented By: W. McKinley Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Paul Gramling
Represented By: Christopher C. Yearout
Represented By: W. McKinley Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Christopher Paul Gramling
Represented By: Christopher C. Yearout
Represented By: W. McKinley Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Sullen
Represented By: Darin Lee Schanker
Represented By: Jere Kyle Bachus
Represented By: John Christopher Elliott
Represented By: William Louis McKinney Bross, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?