Williams v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Katie Williams
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv00678
Filed: November 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Chad W Bryan
Referring Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TEXT ORDER granting #29 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 1/18/2024. (No PDF attached to this entry) (BES)
January 18, 2024 ***PURSUANT TO THE 30 TEXT ORDER - Attorney Lauren Elizabeth Godshall terminated. (No PDF attached to this entry) (BES)
January 17, 2024 Filing 29 Ex Parte MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Lauren Godshall by Katie Williams. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Barnes, Betsy). Added Ex Parte status on 1/18/2024 (BES).
January 17, 2024 Filing 28 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Katie Williams. (Barnes, Betsy)
January 12, 2024 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Betsy J Barnes on behalf of Katie Williams (Barnes, Betsy) (Main Document 27 replaced on 1/16/2024 to remove name of attorney not making an appearance in case) (BES). Modified on 1/16/2024 (BES).
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the motion to admit pro hac vice (doc. #25 ) is GRANTED, and Attorney Betsy J. Barnes is ADMITTED to appear before this Court pro hac vice to represent the Plaintiff. Attorney Barnes shall file a notice of appearance with the Court. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 01/12/2024. (GGN)
January 11, 2024 Filing 25 Motion for Attorney Betsy J. Barnes to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number AALMDC-3565356.) by Katie Williams. (Lewis, Zachary) Modified on 1/16/2024 to reflect requesting atty & reflect that declaration and USDC certificate of good standing included within main PDF (BES).
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the motion (doc. #23 ) is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 01/11/2024. (GGN) (Modified on 1/11/2024 to furnish finance) (GGN).
January 11, 2024 Filing 23 Motion for Attorney Betsy J. Barnes to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number AALMDC-3565018.) by Katie Williams. (Lewis, Zachary) Modified on 1/16/2024 to reflect requesting atty & reflect that declaration and state court certificate of good standing included in main PDF (BES).
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying #14 Motion to Stay Proceedings, as further set out in order. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 1/5/2024. (BES)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: it is ORDERED that on or before 1/17/2024, Attorneys Barnes and Godshall shall SHOW CAUSE in writing why they failed to appear at the 1/3/2024 status conference in accordance with the Court's Order. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 1/3/2024. (BES)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Plf shall file a response to the Dfts' motion on or before 1/24/2024; It is further ORDERED that the Dfts shall file a reply to the Plf's response on or before 1/31/2024. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 1/3/2024. (BES)
January 3, 2024 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Emily C. Marks: Status Conference held on 1/3/2024 (PDF available for court use only). (Court Reporter Dee Coker, 334-799-1573, Dee_Coker@almd.uscourts.gov.) (CS)
December 20, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Paul Gramling on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Gramling, Christopher)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Christopher P. Gramling is ADMITTED to appear before this Court pro hac vice to represent Sanofi; Attorney Gramling shall file a notice of appearance with the Court. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 12/14/2023. (bes, )
December 12, 2023 Filing 16 Motion for Christopher Paul Gramling to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number AALMDC-3551004.) by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Yearout, Christopher) Modified on 12/12/2023 to add atty's name to text (cwl, ).
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: it is ORDERED that this matter is SET for a status conference on 1/3/2024, at 11:00 AM CST by telephone conference call; The parties are DIRECTED to contact Courtroom Deputy Cindy Sanders for the phone number and access code required to participate in the conference call; The Clerk is DIRECTED to provide a court reporter for this proceeding. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 12/11/2023. (furn: calendar, cs, lw) (bes, )
December 7, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay Defendants' Motion to Stay Deadlines by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Dunn, W.)
December 7, 2023 Filing 13 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Hearing Transcript)(Yearout, Christopher)
December 7, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Yearout, Christopher)
December 7, 2023 Filing 11 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Dunn, W.)
December 7, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by W. McKinley Dunn on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Dunn, W.)
December 7, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher C. Yearout on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Yearout, Christopher)
November 21, 2023 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-13676. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TRANSFER ORDER - Case transferred to Middle District of Alabama. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (MDL 2740, Doc. 16511)(sa) [Transferred from laed on 11/21/2023.]
September 27, 2023 Filing 6 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Joint Designation of General and Case-Specific MDL Records to be Included Upon Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(DePaz, Matt) [Transferred from laed on 11/21/2023.]
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI) [Transferred from laed on 11/21/2023.]
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) [Transferred from laed on 11/21/2023.]
December 11, 2017 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (aj) [Transferred from laed on 11/21/2023.]
November 29, 2017 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess) [Transferred from laed on 11/21/2023.]
November 29, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6500061) filed by Katie Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)Attorney Lauren E. Godshall added to party Katie Williams(pty:pla).(Godshall, Lauren) [Transferred from laed on 11/21/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Paul Gramling
Represented By: Christopher C. Yearout
Represented By: W. McKinley Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Paul Gramling
Represented By: Christopher C. Yearout
Represented By: W. McKinley Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Christopher Paul Gramling
Represented By: Christopher C. Yearout
Represented By: W. McKinley Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie Williams
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Godshall
Represented By: Betsy Barnes
Represented By: Betsy J Barnes
Represented By: Zachary R Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?