Nelson v. Alabama Department of Corrections et al (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: Brandon Nelson
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections, Captain Lasseter, Lt. Calhoun, Officer Belcher, Officer Rumph and Officer Steele
Case Number: 2:2023cv00682
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kelly F Pate
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: the undersigned Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS that this case be DISMISSED without prejudice, as further set out in order; Objections to R&R due by 2/1/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly F. Pate on 1/18/2024. (BES)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: it is ORDERED that by December 12, 2023, Plaintiff must file a prison account statement from the inmate account clerk, as further set out in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly F. Pate on 11/28/2023. (Furnished: A/C at Ventress Correctional Facility).(ggn, )
November 21, 2023 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Brandon Nelson. (bes, )
November 21, 2023 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Brandon Nelson.(tps) Modified on 11/22/2023 to remove account statement as attachment (bes, ).
November 21, 2023 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Alabama Department of Corrections, Officer Belcher, Lt. Calhoun, Captain Lasseter, Officer Rumph, Officer Steele, filed by Brandon Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(tps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Alabama Department of Corrections et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Lasseter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Calhoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Belcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Rumph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?