Moseley v. Harris et al
Plaintiff: Lauren Moseley
Defendant: Christopher Ivan Harris, Big's Trucking, Ricky Gray, Pamela Tarter, Jeffrey Tarter, Outlaw Express, LLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Commercial Express, Inc., United Services Automobile Association and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2023cv00683
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Chad W Bryan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2024 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Registration Docs) (Saunders, Anna) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/8/2024 to redact personal information pursuant to E-Gov Rules: #2 Exhibit A (Redacted)) (CWL).
December 27, 2023 Filing 17 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Lauren Moseley re #16 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Strickland, Michael)
December 22, 2023 Filing 16 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Lauren Moseley. Corporate Disclosures due by 1/2/2024. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format) (cwl, )
December 22, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Lauren Moseley. (Attachments: #1 EXHIBIT A, #2 EXHIBIT B) (Strickland, Michael)
December 4, 2023 Filing 14 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Ricky Gray re #11 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Bonner, Eric) Modified on 12/4/2023 to add link (cwl, ).
December 4, 2023 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND, by Ricky Gray.(Bonner, Eric) Modified on 12/4/2023 to add jury demand (cwl, ).
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: the parties are hereby DIRECTED to complete and return the appropriate form so that it is received by the Clerk of Court on or before December 14, 2023, as further set out in order. The consent form should NOT be electronically filed into the record. Do NOT electronically file the reassignment form into the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chad W. Bryan on 11/30/2023. (cwl, )
November 29, 2023 Filing 11 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Ricky Gray. Corporate Disclosures due by 12/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(cwl, )
November 29, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (2 DEFS) Big's Trucking, Christopher Ivan Harris (cwl, )
November 29, 2023 Filing 9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Commercial Express, Inc. Corporate Disclosures due by 12/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(cwl, )
November 29, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (PLF & 8 out of 10 DEFS) Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Commercial Express, Inc., Ricky Gray, Lauren Moseley, Outlaw Express, LLC, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Jeffrey Tarter, Pamela Tarter, United Services Automobile Association (cwl, )
November 29, 2023 Filing 7 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Chad W. Bryan. (cwl, )
November 27, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE (Written Consent to Removal) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Garrett, Richard) Modified on 11/27/2023 to clarify text (cwl, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/28/2023: #1 Corrected Certificate of Service) (cwl, ).
November 27, 2023 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Garrett, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/28/2023: #1 Corrected Certificate of Service) (cwl, ).
November 27, 2023 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint, by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Garrett, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/28/2023: #1 Corrected Certificate of Service) (cwl, ).
November 27, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE (Consent to Removal) by Commercial Express, Inc. (Holtsford, Alex) Modified on 11/27/2023 to clean up text (cwl, ).
November 22, 2023 ANSWER to Complaint, with JURY DEMAND by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (no pdf attached - see doc #1 -2 at page 172 for pdf)(cwl, )
November 22, 2023 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Big's Trucking, Commercial Express, Inc., Ricky Gray, Christopher Ivan Harris, Outlaw Express, LLC, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Jeffrey Tarter, Pamela Tarter, United Services Automobile Association, filed by Lauren Moseley. (no pdf attached - see doc #1 -2 at page 3 for pdf)(cwl, )
November 22, 2023 ANSWER to Complaint, with JURY DEMAND by United Services Automobile Association. (no pdf attached - see doc #1 -2 at page 221 for pdf)(cwl, )
November 22, 2023 Written Consent to Removal (JOINDER) re #1 Notice of Removal, by Ricky Gray, Outlaw Express, LLC, Jeffrey Tarter, Pamela Tarter. (no pdf attached - see doc #1 -31 for pdf) (cwl, )
November 22, 2023 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal. (no pdf attached - see doc #1 -32 for pdf) (cwl, )
November 22, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Saunders, Anna)
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Lowndes County, Alabama, case number 45-cv-2023-900034.00 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AALMDC-3542012) , filed by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 State Court Record, #3 Exhibit 2 Case Action Summary, #4 Exhibit 3 Charasma Moseley Complaint, #5 Exhibit 4 Plaintiff's Email, #6 Exhibit 5 Parents' social media, #7 Exhibit 6 Marriage Certificate, #8 Exhibit 7 Wedding post, #9 Exhibit 8 December 28, 2020 post, #10 Exhibit 9 Graduating Army post, #11 Exhibit 10 Charasma Moseley Post, #12 Exhibit 11 Tik Tok Screenshot, #13 Exhibit 12 Karon Moseley Facebook, #14 Exhibit 13 Brian Lipford Declaration, #15 Exhibit 14 Brian Lipford Domicile, #16 Exhibit 15 Kassie Lipford Domicile, #17 Exhibit 16 Pamela Tarter DOT, #18 Exhibit 17 Pamela Tarter Domicile, #19 Exhibit 18 Jeffrey Tarter Domicile, #20 Exhibit 19 Garrison Insurance docs, #21 Exhibit 20 Garrison Quarterly 2023, #22 Exhibit 21 USAA Quarterly 2023, #23 Exhibit 22 Garrison Corporate Disclosure, #24 Exhibit 23 Missouri License Numbers, #25 Exhibit 24 Garrison Annual Statement, #26 Exhibit 25 USAA Annual Statement, #27 Exhibit 26 USAA Homepage, #28 Exhibit 27 USAA Annual Report, #29 Exhibit 28 Harris Accident Report, #30 Exhibit 29 ALEA Witness Log, #31 Exhibit 30 Consents to Removal, #32 Exhibit 31 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Saunders, Anna) Modified on 11/22/2023 to correct case number (cwl, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moseley v. Harris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Moseley
Represented By: Michael Glen Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Ivan Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big's Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Gray
Represented By: Eric David Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Tarter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Tarter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Outlaw Express, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Anna Cerise Saunders
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commercial Express, Inc.
Represented By: Alex Lafayette Holtsford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Services Automobile Association
Represented By: Sydney Kay Brasfield
Represented By: William Evans Brittain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard Brett Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?