Dennis et al v. Bloomin' Brands, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Edward H. Dennis and Brenda R. Dennis
Defendant: Bloomin' Brands, Inc. and Bonefish Grill
Case Number: 2:2023cv00690
Filed: November 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: For good cause, it is ORDERED that, on or by 2/2/2024, Plaintiffs shall file a Reply to the Defendants' #10 Response to their #4 Motion to Remand. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 1/25/2024. (NO PDF attached to this entry) (AM)
January 24, 2024 Filing 11 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr., as Presider and Magistrate Judge Stephen Michael Doyle, as Referral. Magistrate Judge Stephen Michael Doyle no longer assigned to the case, as Presider. (GGN)
January 19, 2024 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Remand filed by Bloomin' Brands, Inc., Bonefish Grill. (Gambacurta, Virginia) Modified on 1/19/2024 to clarify text (AM).
January 4, 2024 Filing 9 Conflict Disclosure Statement by Brenda R. Dennis re #5 Notice of Deficiency. (Harper, Michael) Modified on 1/5/2024 to remove incorrect filer, & linkage & clarify text (AM).
January 2, 2024 Filing 8 Conflict Disclosure Statement re #5 Notice of Deficiency by Edward H. Dennis. (Harper, Michael) Modified on 1/3/2024 to add linkage & clarify text & remove incorrect filer(AM).
December 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: it is ORDERED that, on or before 1/19/2024, Defendants shall SHOW CAUSE, if any there be, why the #4 motion should not be granted; Plaintiffs may file a reply on or before 2/2/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 12/29/2023. (ALM)
December 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: It is ORDERED that any party wishing to provide such consent must complete the form and submit it to the Clerk of Court by 1/19/2024, as further set out in Order; Any party wishing to submit the reassignment form must mail it to the above address by 1/19/2024, as further set out in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 12/29/2023. (ALM)
December 29, 2023 Filing 5 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Edward H. Dennis & Brenda R. Dennis; Corporate Disclosures due by 1/8/2024. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(ALM)
December 29, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand with attachments by Brenda R. Dennis, Edward H. Dennis. (Harper, Michael)
December 29, 2023 BRIEF in Support of #4 MOTION to Remand with attachments filed by Brenda R. Dennis, Edward H. Dennis. (ALM)
December 1, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (ALL PARTIES) Bloomin' Brands, Inc., Bonefish Grill, Brenda R. Dennis, Edward H. Dennis. (bes, )
December 1, 2023 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen Michael Doyle as Presiding Judge. (bes, )
November 29, 2023 Certificate of Removal Filed with State Court re #1 Notice of Removal by Bloomin' Brands, Inc., Bonefish Grill. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 -3 at page 2 for PDF) (bes, )
November 29, 2023 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Bloomin' Brands, Inc., Bonefish Grill, filed by Edward H. Dennis, Brenda R. Dennis. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 -1 at page 3 for PDF)(bes, )
November 29, 2023 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Bloomin' Brands, Inc.. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 -4 at page 1 for PDF) (bes, )
November 29, 2023 ANSWER to Complaint by Bonefish Grill. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 -7 at page 1 for PDF)(bes, )
November 29, 2023 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Bonefish Grill. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 -5 at page 1 for PDF) (bes, )
November 29, 2023 ANSWER to Complaint by Bloomin' Brands, Inc.. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 -6 at page 1 for PDF)(bes, )
November 29, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the Circuit Court of Montgomery, AL, Case Number 03-cv-2023-901517.00, ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AALMDC-3544131) , filed by Bonefish Grill, Bloomin' Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Removal, #4 Corporate Disclosure Bloomin' Brands, #5 Corporate Disclosure Bonefish, #6 Answer Bloomin' Brands, #7 Answer Bonefish)(Gambacurta, Virginia) Modified on 11/30/2023 to clarify text (bes, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dennis et al v. Bloomin' Brands, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward H. Dennis
Represented By: Michael Stephen Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda R. Dennis
Represented By: Michael Stephen Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bloomin' Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Crawford James McCullers
Represented By: Virginia Flowers Gambacurta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonefish Grill
Represented By: Crawford James McCullers
Represented By: Virginia Flowers Gambacurta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?