Integon National Insurance Company et al v. Law et al
Plaintiff: Integon National Insurance Company and Bristol West Insurance Company
Defendant: William P. Law, United States of America, United States of America Department of Defense, Defense Health Agency and Tricare for Life
Case Number: 2:2023cv00694
Filed: November 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1335 Interpleader Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2024 Reset Answer Deadlines: Defense Health Agency; Tricare for Life; United States of America; and United States of America Department of Defense due 2/26/2024. (GGN)
January 22, 2024 STRICKEN Reset Deadline for answer for Defense Health Agency; Integon National Insurance Company; Tricare for Life; United States of America; and United States of America Department of Defense due 1/26/2024. (GGN) Modified on 1/23/2024 (GGN).
January 22, 2024 Filing 13 Return Receipt Card for United States of America Department of Defense served on 1/3/2024, answer due 2/26/2024. (Sherman, Colin) Modified on 1/23/2024 to correct Answer deadline (GGN).
January 22, 2024 Filing 12 Return Receipt Card for Defense Health Agency served on 12/27/2023; Tricare for Life served on 12/27/2023; United States of America Department of Defense served on 12/27/2023. (Sherman, Colin) Modified on 1/23/2024 to correct answer deadline (GGN).
January 22, 2024 Filing 11 Return Receipt Card for United States of America served on 12/27/2023, answer due 2/26/2024. (Sherman, Colin) Modified on 1/23/2024 to correct answer deadline. (GGN).
December 14, 2023 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Bristol West Insurance Company. (Sasser, Stanley)
December 6, 2023 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Defense Health Agency, Tricare for Life, United States of America, United States of America Department of Defense, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General; NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service and serve with a copy of the Complaint. (ggn, )
December 5, 2023 Filing 8 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Bristol West Insurance Company; Corporate Disclosures due by 12/15/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format) (ggn, )
December 4, 2023 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Integon National Insurance Company. (Sherman, Colin)
December 4, 2023 Filing 6 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr. Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson no longer assigned to the case. (ggn, )
December 1, 2023 Filing 5 (Stricken as erroneous-see #9 for corrected summons) Summons Issued as to United States of America Department of Defense, NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service and serve with a copy of the Complaint. (ggn, ) Modified on 12/6/2023 (ggn, ).
December 1, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to William P. Law. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Summons has been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (ggn, )
December 1, 2023 Filing 3 (Stricken as erroneous-see #9 for corrected summons) Summons Issued as to Defense Health Agency. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Summons has been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (ggn, ) Modified on 12/6/2023 (ggn, ).
December 1, 2023 Filing 2 Case assigned to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson, as presider and Magistrate Judge Stephen Michael Doyle, as referral. (ggn, )
November 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT in Interpleader against Defense Health Agency, William P. Law, Tricare for Life, United States of America, United States of America Department of Defense ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AALMDC-3544891.), filed by Integon National Insurance Company and Bristol West Insurance Company. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 2/28/2024. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Sherman, Colin) Modified on 12/1/2023 to add additional filer and clarify text. (ggn, ). (Attachment 2 replaced on 12/1/2023 to redact personal indicators pursuant to E-gov rules) (ggn, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/1/2023: #7 Proposed Summons Department of Defense, #8 Proposed Summons Law, #9 Proposed Summons Tricare for Life) (ggn, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Integon National Insurance Company et al v. Law et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Integon National Insurance Company
Represented By: Colin Derrick Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bristol West Insurance Company
Represented By: Stanley Scott Sasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Law
Represented By: Misha Mullins Whitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Jonathan S. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America Department of Defense
Represented By: Jonathan S. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defense Health Agency
Represented By: Jonathan S. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tricare for Life
Represented By: Jonathan S. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?