Peacock v. Stone et al (INMATE 4)
Plaintiff: Kelvin Demetris Peacock
Defendant: Matthew R Stone, Rolanda Calloway and Capt. Hudson
Case Number: 2:2023cv00705
Filed: December 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Chad W Bryan
Referring Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the #25 motion is GRANTED such that the Clerk of Court is hereby DIRECTED to substitute Assistant Attorney General Benjamin H. Albritton in the place of Assistant Attorney General Laura E. Howell as counsel of record for Warden Rolanda Calloway and Captain John Hudson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chad W. Bryan on 01/25/2024. (GGN)
January 25, 2024 *** Attorney Laura Elizabeth Howell terminated, as counsel of record for Warden Rolanda Calloway and Captain John Hudson. (NO PDF attached - see #26 Order) (GGN)
January 24, 2024 Filing 25 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Benjamin Howard Albritton for Attorney Laura Elizabeth Howell by Rolanda Calloway, Capt. Hudson. (Albritton, Benjamin) Modified on 1/25/2024 to include attorney names. (DMN)
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Special Report & Answer; Dfts are afforded until 2/23/2024 to file their report and answer as directed in the court's prior #18 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chad W. Bryan on 1/19/2024. (BES)
January 17, 2024 Filing 23 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Rolanda Calloway, Capt. Hudson re #22 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Howell, Laura)
January 17, 2024 Filing 22 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Rolanda Calloway & Capt. Hudson; Corporate Disclosures due by 1/29/2024. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(BES)
January 17, 2024 Filing 21 AO FORM 85 sent to counsel for Rolanda Calloway, Capt. Hudson. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: If the parties wish to consent to the jurisdiction of a US Magistrate Judge, counsel is required to print, sign and mail this form to all parties/counsel in this case. This form should not be returned to the Clerk's Office unless all parties have consented. (BES)
January 12, 2024 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Special Report & Answer by Rolanda Calloway, Capt. Hudson. (Howell, Laura)
December 26, 2023 Filing 19 Return Receipt Card showing service of the #1 Complaint and #18 Procedural Order signed by Barbara B. for ALDOC General Counsel, served on 12/18/2023. (BES)
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT AND ANSWER on or before 1/29/2024; The Clerk is DIRECTED to (1) send a copy of this Order to Plf, and (2) serve copies of this Order and the Complaint via certified mail on Matthew R. Stone, Captain Hudson, Warden Rolanda Calloway, the AL Attorney General, and ALDOC General Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chad W. Bryan on 12/15/2023. (bes, )
December 7, 2023 Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 2:22-cv-01029. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.(bes, ).
December 5, 2023 Partial PLRA Filing fee: receipt number B-8862 (AHI) [Transferred from alnd on 12/8/2023.]
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: The court ADOPTS the report and ACCEPTS the recommendation, GRANTS the motion to transfer venue, and TRANSFERS this action to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Alabama. The original electronic record will be uploaded to the Clerk of Court 10 business days from this date. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 11/22/2023. (AHI) [Transferred from alnd on 12/8/2023.]
October 26, 2023 Filing 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Court RECOMMENDS that the motion to transfer venue be GRANTED and that this action be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Alabama; objections are due within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 10/26/2023. (AHI) [Transferred from alnd on 12/8/2023.]
October 19, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kelvin Demetrius Peacock (AHI) [Transferred from alnd on 12/8/2023.]
October 18, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to clarify and Notice of Change of Address by Kelvin Demetrius Peacock. (AHI) [Transferred from alnd on 12/8/2023.]
October 18, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Transfer Venue by Calloway, Hudson. (Howell, Laura) [Transferred from alnd on 12/8/2023.]
October 16, 2023 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Calloway., WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Calloway. (Howell, Laura) [Transferred from alnd on 12/8/2023.]
October 16, 2023 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Hudson., WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson. (Howell, Laura) [Transferred from alnd on 12/8/2023.]
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT within 60 days from the date of this order; copies mailed to plaintiff; mailed with complaint to named defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 9/7/2023. (AHI) [Transferred from alnd on 12/8/2023.]
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the court having received prisoner consent form the Warden is directed to deduct Monthly Payments from Prison Account of Kelvin Demetrius Peacock as more fully set out in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 11/1/2022. (AHI) [Transferred from alnd on 12/8/2023.]
October 26, 2022 Filing 7 PRISONER CONSENT FORM by Kelvin Demetrius Peacock (AHI) [Transferred from alnd on 12/8/2023.]
October 26, 2022 Initial Partial Filing fee: $ 15.53, receipt number H-93 (AHI) [Transferred from alnd on 12/8/2023.]
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the #5 Motion for Extension of Time; plaintiff has until 10/24/2022 to sign and return prisoner consent form and to pay the initial partial filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 10/3/2022. (AHI) [Transferred from alnd on 12/8/2023.]
September 23, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay Filing Fee by Kelvin Demetrius Peacock. (AHI) [Transferred from alnd on 12/8/2023.]
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Court GRANTS motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, plaintiff is required to pay an initial partial filing fee $15.53, plaintiff is required to return signed attached consent form within 30 days. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 8/26/2022. (AHI) [Transferred from alnd on 12/8/2023.]
August 15, 2022 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE regarding case number (KAM) [Transferred from alnd on 12/8/2023.]
August 12, 2022 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Kelvin Demetrius Peacock. (KAM) [Transferred from alnd on 12/8/2023.] Modified on 12/8/2023 to correct event type and text (bes, ).
August 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Calloway, Hudson, Matthew R Stone, filed by Kelvin Demetrius Peacock.(KAM) [Transferred from alnd on 12/8/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peacock v. Stone et al (INMATE 4)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelvin Demetris Peacock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew R Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rolanda Calloway
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Howell
Represented By: Benjamin Howard Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt. Hudson
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Howell
Represented By: Benjamin Howard Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?