Duncan v. Security and Medical Staff at Elmore Correctional Facility (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: Dale Duncan
Defendant: Security and Medical Staff at Elmore Correctional Facility
Case Number: 2:2024cv00160
Filed: March 12, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Charles S Coody
Referring Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2024 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Dale Duncan. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(AM)
March 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: it is ORDERED that by 4/4/2024, Plf must file an amended complaint, as further set out in order; the Clerk is DIRECTED to provide him with a copy of the form used by prisoners to file 1983 complaints. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Coody on 3/21/2024. (BES)
March 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk Elmore CF. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Coody on 3/21/2024. (FURN: Cashier) (LAB)
March 20, 2024 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Dale Duncan. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(AM)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: it is ORDERED that by March 26, 2024, Plaintiff must submit an inmate account statement reflecting the average monthly balance in his prison account and the average monthly deposits to his account for the 6-month period immediately preceding the filing of the Complaint. The Clerk is DIRECTED to provide a copy of this Order to the inmate account clerk at the facility where Plaintiff is incarcerated, as further set out in the Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Coody on 03/12/2024. (copy mailed to a/c at Elmore Correctional Facility as directed)(furn: cashier)(GGN)
March 12, 2024 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Dale Duncan. (TPS)
March 12, 2024 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Security and Medical Staff at Elmore Correctional Facility, filed by Dale Duncan.(TPS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duncan v. Security and Medical Staff at Elmore Correctional Facility (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security and Medical Staff at Elmore Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?