State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Heartland Recreational Vehicles, LLC et al (MAG2)
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Defendant: Heartland Recreational Vehicles, LLC and Norcold, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2024cv00250
Filed: April 26, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kelly F Pate
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2024 Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Dodd, Katelyn)
June 21, 2024 Filing 17 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company re #16 Order (Cohn, Benjamin) Modified text on 6/21/2024 (LAB).
June 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: it is ORDERED that by June 27, 2024, Plaintiff must file an amended corporate disclosure statement that corrects this deficiency. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly F. Pate on 6/20/2024. (See Order for Details) (LAB)
June 18, 2024 Filing 15 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company . (Cohn, Benjamin) Modified to remove link on 6/18/2024 (LAB).
June 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RULE 26(f) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the parties confer and submit a report based on the trial terms and scheduling order requirements of the Middle District of Alabama. The Rule 26(f) report is due by June 24, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly F. Pate on 6/10/2024. (See Order for Further Details) (LAB)
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: it is ORDERED that, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636, this case is referred to the United States Magistrate Judge for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks United States District Judge for United States District Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/4/2024. (LAB)
June 3, 2024 Filing 12 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson as Presiding Judge and Magistrate Judge Kelly F. Pate as Referral Judge. Magistrate Judge Kelly F. Pate no longer assigned as Presiding Judge. (LAB)
May 8, 2024 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement re: #8 Notice of Deficiency by Heartland Recreational Vehicles, LLC. (Bolt, Weathers) Modified on 5/9/2024 to add linkage & clarify text (AM).
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Counsel for the parties are DIRECTED to complete the appropriate attached form and send it to the Clerk of the Court by 5/29/2024. As explained in the attached notice, a party may consent electronically, but neither the consent form nor the request for reassignment form should be filed electronically, as further set out in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly F. Pate on 5/8/2024. (HRR)
May 7, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Heartland Recreational Vehicles, LLC (HRR)
May 7, 2024 Filing 8 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Heartland Recreational Vehicles, LLC Corporate Disclosures due by 5/17/2024. (HRR)
May 7, 2024 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Heartland Recreational Vehicles, LLC. (Bolt, Weathers)
May 3, 2024 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Norcold, Inc.. (McDowell, David)
April 29, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Norcold, Inc. & State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (AM)
April 29, 2024 Filing 4 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Kelly F. Pate. (AM)
April 26, 2024 NOTICE of Filing of Removal to State Court by Norcold, Inc. (NO PDF - See #1 -2) (AM)
April 26, 2024 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Heartland Recreational Vehicles, LLC, Norcold, Inc., filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (NO PDF - See #1 -1)(AM)
April 26, 2024 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Norcold, Inc.. (McDowell, David)
April 26, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Katelyn Kimberly Dodd on behalf of Norcold, Inc. (Dodd, Katelyn)
April 26, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Bullock County, Alabama, case number CV-2024-900013.00. ( Filing fee $405 receipt number AALMDC-3631048) , filed by Norcold, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (McDowell, David) (Attachment 4 replaced on 4/29/2024 to lock down fill-able pdf) (AM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Heartland Recreational Vehicles, LLC et al (MAG2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Benjamin David Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heartland Recreational Vehicles, LLC
Represented By: Weathers Preston Bolt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norcold, Inc.
Represented By: Katelyn Kimberly Dodd
Represented By: David Whittington McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?