Allen v. Tallapoosa County Jail Staff et al (Inmate 1)
Case Number: |
3:2006cv00772 |
Filed: |
August 28, 2006 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama |
Office: |
Opelika Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Terry F. Moorer |
Presiding Judge: |
William Keith Watkins |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 30, 2009 |
Filing
39
ORDERED that: (1) The 38 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED; (2) With respect to Plaintiff's claim regarding the prosecution of her assailant, Defendants' motion for summary judgment is GRANTED; (3) With respect to Plaintif f's failure-to-protect claim, Defendants' motion for summary judgment is GRANTED to the extent that Defendants seek dismissal of this case; (4) Plaintiff's failure-to-protect claim is DISMISSED with prejudice in accordance with the provisions of 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(a) as further set out; and (5) This action is dismissed with prejudice. An appropriate judgment will be entered. Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 6/30/2009. (cb, )
|
June 1, 2009 |
Filing
38
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Inmate 1983 Complaint filed by Bertha Allen that: 1. With respect to the plaintiff's claim regarding the prosecution of her assailant, the defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment be GRANTED as such claim doe s not implicate a violation of any constitutionally protected interest. 2. With respect to the plaintiff's failure to protect claim, the defendants' motion for summary judgment be GRANTED to the extent the defendants seek dismissal of this case due to the plaintiff's failure to properly exhaust an administrative remedy previously available to her at the Tallapoosa County Jail. 3. The plaintiff's failure to protect claim be dismissed with prejudice in accordance with the provi sions of 42 U.S.C. 1997e(a) for the plaintiff's failure to exhaust an administrative remedy available to her during her confinement in the Tallapoosa County Jail. 4. This case be dismissed with prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 6/15/2009. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 6/1/2009. (dmn)
|
August 30, 2006 |
Filing
3
ORDER granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at JTP for Women. Signed by Judge Delores R. Boyd on 8/30/06. (furn: cashier)(vma, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?