McCullough v. Jones et al (INMATE2)

Plaintiff: Christopher McCullough
Defendant: Troy King and Daniel Jones
Case Number: 3:2007cv00026
Filed: January 8, 2007
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: Chambers
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 12, 2009 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that 49 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED and that the petition for habeas corpus relief filed by Petitioner Christopher McCullough is DISMISSED without prejudice to afford him an opportunity to exhaust all available state court remedies. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 8/12/2009. (cb, )
July 22, 2009 49 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the 1 petition for habeas corpus relief filed by Petitioner Christopher McCullough be DISMISSED without prejudice to afford him an opportunity to exhaust all available state court remedies. Objections to R&R due by 8/3/2009. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 7/22/2009. (cb, )
March 25, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that on or before 4/8/2009 Petitioner may file a response to the answer filed by Respondents. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 3/25/2009. (cb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCullough v. Jones et al (INMATE2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy King
Represented By: Marc Alan Starrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Jones
Represented By: Marc Alan Starrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher McCullough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?