Williford v. Williford (MAG+)

Appellant: Kenneth Williford
Appellee: Charlotte Williford
Case Number: 3:2007cv00105
Filed: February 6, 2007
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 21, 2007 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING present appeal pending a ruling by the Bankruptcy Judge on appellant's pending motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis; directing the Clerk to provide a copy of this order, the motion for leave to appeal informa pauperis, and the declaration in support of the motion to the Clerk of the bankrupty court for docketing in the underlying bankruptcy case (Case No. 03-81486-WRS); directing the Clerk of the bankruptcy court to forward a copy of the Bankruptcy Judge's order to this court. Signed by Judge Susan Russ Walker on 2/21/07. Copies furnished to Clerk US Bankruptcy Court, as directed.(djy, ).
February 13, 2007 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 3 motion to suspend the rule, as further set out in order; further ORDERING that appellant's 5 Motion to Amend his "Federal Court of Civil Appeals Docketing Statement", which the court construes in part as a motion fo r leave to amend the record to include the designation of the record on appeal, is GRANTED to the extent that the court will treat the motion 5 as the designation of the record on appeal required by Bankruptcy Rule 8006; to the extent the motion se eks an order directing the preparation of a transcript for all courtroom and telephone hearings conducted during the entire bankruptcy proceeding, the motion is DENIED, as further set out in order. Signed by Judge Susan Russ Walker on 2/13/07. (djy, )
February 8, 2007 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Susan Russ Walker for all pretrial proceedings and entry of any orders or recommendations as may be appropriate. Signed by Judge William Keith Watkins on 2/8/2007. (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williford v. Williford (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Kenneth Williford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Charlotte Williford
Represented By: April W. McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?