Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Fourth Quarter, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Universal-Duchess Music Corporation, Night Garden Music, Stephen Andrew Perkins, Rio Bravo Music, Inc., EMI Virgin Songs, Inc., Eric Adam Avery, Perry Farrell, David Michael Navarro, Bocephus Music, Inc., House of Cash, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Fantasy, Inc., Evil Eye Music, Inc., Michael Balzary, John Anthony Frusciante, Anthony Kiedis, Chad Gaylord Smith, Spirit One Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Songs of Universal, Inc., James W. Buffett, Ensign Music LLC, Unichappell Music Inc., John Fararr, Rivers Cuomo, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Anthony L. Ray, Azoff Entertainment, Inc., Warner Brothers Records, Inc. and Todd Park Mohr
Defendant: Fourth Quarter, Inc., Patrick J. Grider and Daniel Grider
Case Number: 3:2007cv00921
Filed: October 12, 2007
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2010 64 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT entered In favor of Evil Eye Music, Inc. Against Fourth Quarter, Inc., In favor of Night Garden Music Against Fourth Quarter, Inc., In favor of Stephen Andrew Perkins Against Fourth Quarter, Inc., In favor of Anthony L. Ray Against Fourth Quarter, Inc., In favor of Universal-Duchess Music Corporation Against Fourth Quarter, Inc., In favor of Broadcast Music, Inc. Against Fourth Quarter, Inc., In favor of John Anthony Frusciante Against Fourth Quarter, Inc., In favor of Perry Farrell Against Fourth Quarter, Inc., In favor of EMI Virgin Songs, Inc. Against Fourth Quarter, Inc., In favor of James W. Buffett Against Fourth Quarter, Inc., In favor of Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc. Against Fourth Quarter, Inc., In favor of All Plaintiffs Against Fourth Quarter, Inc., In favor of Anthony Kiedis Against Fourth Quarter, Inc., In favor of Spirit One Music Against Fourth Quarter, Inc., In favor of Michael Balzary Against Fourth Quarter, Inc., In favor of John Fararr Against Fourth Quarter, Inc., In favor of Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. Against Fourth Quarter, Inc., In favor of Songs of Universal, Inc. Against Fourth Quarter, Inc., In favor of Fantasy, Inc. Against Fourth Quarter, Inc., In favor of Bocephus Music, Inc. Against Fourth Quarter, Inc., In favor of Rivers Cuomo Against Fourth Quarter, Inc., In favor of Eric Adam Avery Against Fourth Quarter, Inc., In favor of Rio Bravo Music, Inc. Against Fourth Quarter, Inc., In favor of Azoff Entertainment, Inc. Against Fourth Quarter, Inc., In favor of Warner Brothers Records, Inc. Against Fourth Quarter, Inc., In favor of House of Cash, Inc. Against Fourth Quarter, Inc., In favor of David Michael Navarro Against Fourth Quarter, Inc., In favor of Ensign Music LLC Against Fourth Quarter, Inc., In favor of Todd Park Mohr Against Fourth Quarter, Inc., In favor of Chad Gaylord Smith Against Fourth Quarter, Inc., In favor of Unichappell Music Inc. Against Fourth Quarter, Inc. by Broadcast Music, Inc.. (Johnston, Gilbert)
April 9, 2008 63 CONSENT JUDGMENT as further set out in order. Ordered that each party shall bear his or her own costs. The Clerk is directed to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the FRCP. Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson on 4/9/08. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist) (Term: PT-9/3/08; JT-10/14/08)(sl, )
April 3, 2008 62 STIPULATION for Consent Judgment by All Plaintiffs, Fourth Quarter, Inc., Patrick J. Grider, Daniel Grider. (Johnston, Gilbert)
January 16, 2008 61 NOTICE of Non-Compliance re 60 Initial Disclosures. The referenced pleading is discovery and is not allowed pursuant to Local Rule 5.1 NON-FILING OF CIVIL DISCOVERY. The referenced pleading is hereby STRICKEN from the record and the parties are instructed to disregard the entry of Doc. 60 on the court's docket. (dmn)
January 15, 2008 60 [STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD. THIS PLEADING IS DISCOVERY AND IS NOT ALLOWED PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 5.1 NON-FILING OF CIVIL DISCOVERY.-DMN] NOTICE by John Anthony Frusciante, Anthony Kiedis, Chad Gaylord Smith, Spirit One Music, Bocephus Music, Inc., House of Cash, Inc., EMI Virgin Songs, Inc., Eric Adam Avery, Perry Farrell, Broadcast Music, Inc., David Michael Navarro, Stephen Andrew Perkins, Rio Bravo Music, Inc., Night Garden Music, Universal-Duchess Music Corporation, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Songs of Universal, Inc., Fantasy, Inc., James W. Buffett, Ensign Music LLC, Unichappell Music Inc., John Fararr, Rivers Cuomo, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Anthony L. Ray, Azoff Entertainment, Inc., Warner Brothers Records, Inc., Todd Park Mohr, Evil Eye Music, Inc., Michael Balzary of Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures (Lindsay, Mark) Modified on 1/16/2008 (dmn).
January 11, 2008 ***Attorney William David Dawson for Fourth Quarter, Inc. and Patrick J. Grider added pursuatn to 59 Conflict Disclosure Statement filed 1/11/08. (sl, )
January 11, 2008 59 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Daniel Grider. (Whittelsey, Davis)
January 11, 2008 58 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Patrick J. Grider. (Whittelsey, Davis)
January 11, 2008 57 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Fourth Quarter, Inc., Patrick J. Grider, Daniel Grider. (Whittelsey, Davis)
December 18, 2007 56 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's 53 Brief in Opposition to Defendant's 46 MOTION to Strike 44 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Fourth Quarter, Inc., Patrick J. Grider, Daniel Grider. (Whittelsey, Davis) Modified on 12/19/2007 to create link to brief and M/Strike (cb, ).
December 18, 2007 55 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 9/3/2008; Jury Trial set for term of court commencing on 10/14/2008; Amended Pleadings due by 12/3/07 by plaintiffs and 1/31/2008 by the defendants; Discovery due by 5/15/2008; Dispositive Motions due by 6/3/2008; Mediation Notice due by 6/30/2008. Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/18/07. (sl, )
December 18, 2007 54 Featured Case ORDERED as follows: (1) the 44 application for entry of default is denied; (2) the 46 motion to strike is denied as moot; (3) the 46 objection is overruled as moot. Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/18/07. (sl, )
December 17, 2007 53 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion to Strike and Objection filed by John Anthony Frusciante, Anthony Kiedis, Chad Gaylord Smith, Spirit One Music, Bocephus Music, Inc., House of Cash, Inc., EMI Virgin Songs, Inc., Eric Adam Avery, Perry Farrell, Broadcast Music, Inc., David Michael Navarro, Stephen Andrew Perkins, Rio Bravo Music, Inc., Night Garden Music, Universal-Duchess Music Corporation, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Songs of Universal, Inc., Fantasy, Inc., James W. Buffett, Ensign Music LLC, Unichappell Music Inc., John Fararr, Rivers Cuomo, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Anthony L. Ray, Azoff Entertainment, Inc., Warner Brothers Records, Inc., Todd Park Mohr, Evil Eye Music, Inc., Michael Balzary. (Lindsay, Mark)
December 17, 2007 52 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lindsay, Mark)
December 17, 2007 51 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support of Defendants' Motion and Objection to Strike Plaintiffs' Application for Entry of Default filed by Fourth Quarter, Inc., Patrick J. Grider, Daniel Grider. (Attachments: # 1)(Whittelsey, Davis)
December 13, 2007 50 RESPONSE to Motion re MOTION to Strike 44 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by John Anthony Frusciante, Anthony Kiedis, Chad Gaylord Smith, Spirit One Music, Bocephus Music, Inc., House of Cash, Inc., EMI Virgin Songs, Inc., Eric Adam Avery, Perry Farrell, Broadcast Music, Inc., David Michael Navarro, Stephen Andrew Perkins, Rio Bravo Music, Inc., Night Garden Music, Universal-Duchess Music Corporation, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Songs of Universal, Inc., Fantasy, Inc., James W. Buffett, Ensign Music LLC, Unichappell Music Inc., John Fararr, Rivers Cuomo, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Anthony L. Ray, Azoff Entertainment, Inc., Warner Brothers Records, Inc., Todd Park Mohr, Evil Eye Music, Inc., Michael Balzary. (Lindsay, Mark)
December 12, 2007 49 Notice of Filing of Original Executed Evidentiary Submission in support of defendants' 46 Objection and Motion to Strike plaintiffs' Application for Entry of Default and Verification filed by Fourth Quarter, Inc., Patrick J. Grider, Daniel Grider. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-e-mail# 2 Exhibit B-e-mail/letter)(sl, )
December 11, 2007 48 Evidentiary Submission re 44 MOTION for Entry of Default by Plaintiffs filed by Fourth Quarter, Inc., Patrick J. Grider, Daniel Grider. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Whittelsey, Davis)
December 11, 2007 47 Featured Case ORDERED that the 46 motion and objection to strike are set for submission, without oral argument, on 12/17/07 with all briefs due by said date. Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/11/07. (sl, )
December 10, 2007 MOTION to Strike 44 Application for Entry of Default by Fourth Quarter, Inc., Patrick J. Grider, Daniel Grider. (This document has no pdf attached. See 46 for pdf) (sl, )
December 10, 2007 46 RESPONSE to Motion re 44 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Fourth Quarter, Inc., Patrick J. Grider, Daniel Grider. (Whittelsey, Davis)
December 10, 2007 45 Grider, (Whittelsey, Davis) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Fourth Quarter, Inc., Patrick J. Grider, Daniel Grider.(Whittelsey, Davis)
December 5, 2007 44 TERMINATED PURSUANT TO INSTRUCTIONS FROM THE CLERK OF COURT DUE TO THE FILING OF 45 ANSWER. MOTION for Entry of Default by John Anthony Frusciante, Anthony Kiedis, Chad Gaylord Smith, Spirit One Music, Bocephus Music, Inc., House of Cash, Inc., EMI Virgin Songs, Inc., Eric Adam Avery, Perry Farrell, Broadcast Music, Inc., David Michael Navarro, Stephen Andrew Perkins, Rio Bravo Music, Inc., Night Garden Music, Universal-Duchess Music Corporation, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Songs of Universal, Inc., Fantasy, Inc., James W. Buffett, Ensign Music LLC, Unichappell Music Inc., John Fararr, Rivers Cuomo, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Anthony L. Ray, Azoff Entertainment, Inc., Warner Brothers Records, Inc., Todd Park Mohr, Evil Eye Music, Inc., Michael Balzary. (Johnston, Gilbert) Modified on 12/12/2007 (cc, ). Modified on 9/11/2008 (djy, ).
November 29, 2007 43 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to defendants Fourth Quarter, Patrick Grider and Daniel Grider Corporate Disclosures due by 12/13/2007. (Attachments: # 1)(sl, )
November 27, 2007 42 Featured Case ORDER granting 41 Motion to Continue deadline. The parties are allowed until 12/17/07 to file their Rule 26(f) report. Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/27/07. (sl, )
November 19, 2007 41 MOTION to Continue Deadline for Filing Rule 26(f) by Fourth Quarter, Inc., Patrick J. Grider, Daniel Grider. (Whittelsey, Davis)
November 19, 2007 40 Featured Case ORDER granting 12 Motion for Mark V. Lindsay to appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/19/07. (sl, )
November 16, 2007 39 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Todd Park Mohr, an individual d/b/a/ Park Mohr Publishing Company. (sl, )
November 16, 2007 38 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc. (sl, )
November 16, 2007 37 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by John Fararr d/b/a/ John Farrar Music. (sl, )
November 16, 2007 36 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Unichappell Music Inc. (sl, )
November 16, 2007 35 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Ensign Music LLC. (sl, )
November 16, 2007 34 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by James W. Buffett, an individual d/b/a/ Coral Reefer Music. (sl, )
November 16, 2007 33 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by EMI Virgin Songs, Inc. d/b/a/ EMI Longitude Music. (sl, )
November 16, 2007 32 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. (sl, )
November 16, 2007 31 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Universal-Duchess Music Corporation. (sl, )
November 16, 2007 30 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Rio Bravo Music, Inc. (sl, )
November 16, 2007 29 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Stephen Andrew Perkins, d/b/a/ Swizzlestick Music. (sl, )
November 16, 2007 28 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by David Michael Navarro, d/b/a/ Embryotic Music. (sl, )
November 16, 2007 27 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Perry Farrell, d/b/a/ I'll Hit you Back Music. (sl, )
November 16, 2007 26 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by House of Cash, Inc. (sl, )
November 16, 2007 25 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Bocephus Music, Inc. (sl, )
November 16, 2007 24 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by John Anthony Frusciante, Anthony Kiedis, Chad Gaylord Smith, Michael Balzary. (sl, )
November 16, 2007 23 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Eric Adam Avery, d/b/a/ Bubbly Orange Stuff Music. (sl, )
November 16, 2007 22 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Fantasy, Inc., d/b/a/ Jondora Music. (sl, )
November 16, 2007 21 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music, Inc. (sl, )
November 16, 2007 20 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Evil Eye Music, Inc. (sl, )
November 16, 2007 19 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Spirit One Music, A Division of Spirit Music Group, Inc. (sl, )
November 16, 2007 18 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Songs of Universal, Inc. (sl, )
November 16, 2007 17 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Anthony L. Ray. (sl, )
November 16, 2007 16 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by EMI Virgin Songs, Inc. (sl, )
November 16, 2007 15 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Night Garden Music, A Division of R. E. M./Athens, LTD. (sl, )
November 16, 2007 14 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Rivers Cuomo. (sl, )
November 16, 2007 13 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Azoff Entertainment, Inc., Warner Brothers Records, Inc. (sl, )
November 15, 2007 12 Motion for Mark V. Lindsay to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 20.00 receipt number 4602001188.) by plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing# 2 Filing Fee Receipt)(sl, )
November 5, 2007 11 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to counsel for defendants. Corporate Disclosures due by 11/20/2007. (sl, )
November 5, 2007 10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to plaintiffs' counsel. Corporate Disclosures due by 11/20/2007. (sl, )
November 5, 2007 9 Featured Case ORDER that Rule 26 Meeting Report is due by 11/19/2007. Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/5/2007. (cc, )
November 5, 2007 8 Featured Case ORDER denying 6 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/5/2007. (cc, )
November 2, 2007 7 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Fourth Quarter, Inc., Patrick J. Grider, Daniel Grider. (Whittelsey, Davis)
November 2, 2007 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Fourth Quarter, Inc., Patrick J. Grider, Daniel Grider. (Whittelsey, Davis)
October 17, 2007 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Fourth Quarter, Inc. served on 10/16/2007, answer due 11/5/2007. (sl, )
October 17, 2007 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Patrick J. Grider served on 10/16/2007, answer due 11/5/2007. (sl, )
October 17, 2007 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Daniel Grider served on 10/16/2007, answer due 11/5/2007. (sl, )
October 12, 2007 2 Summons Issued as to Fourth Quarter, Inc., Patrick J. Grider, Daniel Grider and returned to counsel for personal service of complaint. (sl, )
October 12, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Fourth Quarter, Inc., Patrick J. Grider, Daniel Grider ( Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 4602000732.), filed by John Anthony Frusciante, Anthony Kiedis, Chad Gaylord Smith, Spirit One Music, Bocephus Music, Inc., House of Cash, Inc., EMI Virgin Songs, Inc., Eric Adam Avery, Perry Farrell, Broadcast Music, Inc., David Michael Navarro, Stephen Andrew Perkins, Rio Bravo Music, Inc., Night Garden Music, Universal-Duchess Music Corporation, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Songs of Universal, Inc., Fantasy, Inc., James W. Buffett, Ensign Music LLC, Unichappell Music Inc., John Fararr, Rivers Cuomo, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Anthony L. Ray, Azoff Entertainment, Inc., Warner Brothers Records, Inc., Todd Park Mohr, Evil Eye Music, Inc., Michael Balzary. (Attachments: # 1 Schedule# 2 Filing Fee Receipt)(sl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Fourth Quarter, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal-Duchess Music Corporation
Represented By: Mark V. Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Night Garden Music
Represented By: Mark V. Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Andrew Perkins
Represented By: Mark V. Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rio Bravo Music, Inc.
Represented By: Mark V. Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Virgin Songs, Inc.
Represented By: Mark V. Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Adam Avery
Represented By: Mark V. Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry Farrell
Represented By: Mark V. Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Michael Navarro
Represented By: Mark V. Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bocephus Music, Inc.
Represented By: Gilbert E. Johnston, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: House of Cash, Inc.
Represented By: Mark V. Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Mark V. Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fantasy, Inc.
Represented By: Mark V. Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evil Eye Music, Inc.
Represented By: Mark V. Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Balzary
Represented By: Mark V. Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Anthony Frusciante
Represented By: Mark V. Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Kiedis
Represented By: Mark V. Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Gaylord Smith
Represented By: Mark V. Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spirit One Music
Represented By: Mark V. Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.
Represented By: Mark V. Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Songs of Universal, Inc.
Represented By: Mark V. Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James W. Buffett
Represented By: Mark V. Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ensign Music LLC
Represented By: Mark V. Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unichappell Music Inc.
Represented By: Mark V. Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Fararr
Represented By: Mark V. Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rivers Cuomo
Represented By: Mark V. Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.
Represented By: Mark V. Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony L. Ray
Represented By: Mark V. Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Azoff Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Mark V. Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner Brothers Records, Inc.
Represented By: Mark V. Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Park Mohr
Represented By: Mark V. Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fourth Quarter, Inc.
Represented By: Davis Butterfield Whittelsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick J. Grider
Represented By: Davis Butterfield Whittelsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Grider
Represented By: Davis Butterfield Whittelsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?