Arrowood Indemnity Company v. Macon County Greyhound Park, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Arrowood Indemnity Company
Defendant: Macon County Greyhound Park, Inc. and Ronnie Lawrence
Case Number: 3:2008cv00812
Filed: October 3, 2008
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Insurance Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2010 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that pursuant to 41 Stipulation of Dismissal without prejudice, Count II (bad faith) of 32 Counterclaim is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 1/22/2010. (jg, )
January 7, 2010 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 38 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. ORDERED that the following deadlines are contingent upon the dismissal of the asserted bad faith counterclaim (see Doc. 32 ). It is further ORDERED that (1) The parties shall complete limited disc overy for the purposes of filing dispositive motions on or before 3/8/2010. Failure to complete discovery shall not be sufficient grounds to extend the dispositive motion deadline; and (2) Any dispositive motions, i.e., motions to dismiss or motions for summary judgment, shall be filed no later than 4/8/2010. A brief and all supporting evidence shall be filed with any such motion as further set out in the order. Discovery due by 3/8/2010. Motions due by 4/8/2010. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 1/7/2010. (dmn)
November 23, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant Macon County Greyhound Park, Inc.'s 26 MOTION to Remove this Matter from the Court's Administrative Docket and Reinstate as an Active Matter is GRANTED. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 11/23/2009. (dmn)
November 12, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff TO SHOW CAUSE as to why the 26 Motion to Remove this Matter from the Court's Administrative Docket and Reinstate as an Active Matter should not be granted. Show Cause Response due by no later than 5:00 p.m. on Monday, 11/16/2009. Defendants may file a reply by no later than 5:00 p.m. on Thursday, November 19. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 11/12/2009. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arrowood Indemnity Company v. Macon County Greyhound Park, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arrowood Indemnity Company
Represented By: Keith S. Rivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macon County Greyhound Park, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?