Greer-El v. Culliver et al (INMATE2)

Plaintiff: Jerome Greer-El
Defendant: Warden Culliver and Troy King
Case Number: 3:2008cv01013
Filed: December 22, 2008
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Escambia
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 28, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 27 Report and Recommendations; that the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED and that the petition for habeas corpus relief is DISMISSED without prejudice to afford petitioner an opportunity to exhaust all available state court remedies. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 7/28/2009. (cc, )
June 22, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court VACATED PURSUANT TO 35 ORDER. ORDER adopting 27 Report and Recommendations; that the petition for habeas corpus relief is DISMISSED without prejudice to afford petitioner an opportunity to exhaust all available state court remedies. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 6/22/2009. (cc, ) Modified on 7/7/2009 (cc, ).
May 28, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that 1 petition for habeas corpus relief be DISMISSED without prejudice to afford Petitioner an opportunity to exhaust all available state court remedies; Objections to R&R due by 6/11/2009. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 5/28/2009. (cc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greer-El v. Culliver et al (INMATE2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Greer-El
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Culliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?