Guarino v. Auburn University et al

Plaintiff: Anthony J. Guarino
Defendant: Auburn University, Jay Gogue, John Heilman, Frances Kochan, Kelly G. Taylor and Shannon Henderson
Case Number: 3:2009cv00080
Filed: January 30, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 30, 2010 81 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT granting the 79 Motion to Dismiss; dismissing the case in its entirety with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and expenses. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment under Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 6/30/2010. term: PTC set for 07/23/2010; JT set for 08/23/2010 (br, ) Modified on 7/1/2010 to correct typo (br, ).
November 17, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER as follows: (1) Henderson's 32 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED; (2) Auburn University's 35 Motion to Clarify is DENIED; (3) Guarino's 40 Motion for Leave of Court to Allow Plaintiff's Counterclaim to the Counterclaim of defendant Shannon Henderson, is DENIED. The Clerk is directed to strike Guarino's 37 Counterclaim to the Counterclaim of defendant Shannon Henderson from the record. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 11/17/09. (sl, )
October 20, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER as follows: (1) Guarino's 29 Motion to Amend Complaint is denied; (2) Guarino's 30 Motion to Strike "Out of Residency" claim of defendant Henderson is denied; (3) Guarino's 33 Motion to Amend Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice is denied. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 10/20/09. (sl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guarino v. Auburn University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony J. Guarino
Represented By: Julian Lenwood McPhillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auburn University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Gogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Heilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frances Kochan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly G. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?