Whitten v. Butler et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: John Mark Whitten
Defendant: Freddie Butler and Troy King
Case Number: 3:2009cv00201
Filed: March 9, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Marion
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION directing that, upon an independent review of the file in this case and upon consideration of the 17 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the 17 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge be and is hereby ADOPTED and that: (1) The 28 U.S.C. § 2254 petition for habeas corpus relief filed by John Mark Whitten is DENIED as Whitten failed to file the petition within the applicable one-year period of limitation; (2) This case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 9/27/11. (scn, )
May 1, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 13 Motion for Discovery is hereby DENIED as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 5/1/2009. (dmn)
April 24, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 10 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by respondents be and is hereby GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the respondents be GRANTED an extension from 4/23/2009 to and including 5/4/2009 to file a corporate disclosure/conflict statement. Corporate Disclosures deadline reset to 5/4/2009. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 4/24/2009. (dmn)
March 10, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that on or 3/25/2009 the petitioner shall forward to the Clerk of this Court the $5.00 filing fee. It is further ORDERED that except to the extent that payment is required under this order the petitioner's 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 3/10/2009.(dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitten v. Butler et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Mark Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freddie Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?