Bullard v. Denson et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: Harold Douglas Bullard
Defendant: Judge Denson, Judge Smithart, Judge Young and Judge Fuller
Case Number: 3:2009cv00224
Filed: March 19, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Mandamus & Other Office
County: Barbour
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 28, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that: 1) The 4 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED; and 2) The 1983 claims presented against Judges Denson, Smithart, Young, and Fuller be DISMISSED with prejudice in accordance with the directives of 28 USC 1915(e)(2) (B)(i) and/or (iii); 3) Plf's challenge to the constitutionality of the convictions and sentences imposed upon him by the Circuit Courts for Lee, Barbour, Elmore, and Tallapoosa Counties, Alabama be DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to the pr ovisions of 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) as such claims are not properly before the court at this time; and 3) This complaint be DISMISSED prior to service of process; An appropriate judgment will be entered. Signed by Honorable Truman M. Hobbs on 4/28/2009. (wcl, )
April 8, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that: 1) The 1983 claims presented against Judges Denson, Smithart, Young, and Fuller be DISMISSED with prejudice in accordance with the directives of 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and/or (iii); 2) Plf' ;s challenge to the constitutionality of the convictions and sentences imposed upon him by the Circuit Courts of Lee, Barbour, Elmore, and Tallapoosa Counties, Alabama, be DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to the provisions of 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) as such claims are not properly before the court at this time; and 3) This complaint be DISMISSED prior to service of process; Objections to R&R due by 4/21/2009. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 4/8/2009. (wcl, )
March 23, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Ventress Corr Fac, as directed. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 3/23/09. Furnished to cashier. (djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bullard v. Denson et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Douglas Bullard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Denson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Smithart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?