Tignor v. United States of America (INMATE 3)

Plaintiff: Bernardo Lee Tignor
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2009cv00291
Filed: April 7, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: W. Harold Albritton
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 7, 2011 54 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT directing that, in accordance with the 53 Order entered in this case, final judgment is entered in favor of the Petitioner, Bernardo Lee Tignor, and against the United States. Costs taxed as paid. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 10/7/11. (scn, )
August 30, 2011 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that a pretrial conference will be held on August 30, 2011 at 10:30am, before the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 8/30/11. (Furnished to Calendar and KG.) (Courtesy copy via CM/ECF to USM.)(scn, )
May 20, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that on or before June 13, 2011, the the government shall file a supplemental response addressing the following questions: (1) Whether, in Tignor's case, application of the violent felony enhancement, as defined in 18 U.S.C.  7; 924(e)(2)(B), resulted in a higher statutory minimum and maximum sentence under § 924(e); (2) If application of the violent felony enhancement defined in § 924(e)(2)(B) resulted in a higher statutory minimum and maximum sentence under &# 167; 924(e), whether Tignor presents a cognizable claim for collateral relief in his § 2255 motion entitling him to be resentenced; and (3) Whether Tignor's claim of sentencing error is procedurally defaulted. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 5/20/11. (scn, )
July 16, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that on or before 8/31/2009, the United States shall file a supplemental response addressing the arguments presented in the Brief/Memorandum in support of the petitioner's 28 U.S.C. 2255 motion filed by counsel for the petitioner on 7/15/2009 (Doc. No. 26 ). Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr. on 7/16/2009. (dmn)
May 28, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing counsel for the petitioner to file, on or before 7/13/2009, a memorandum in support of the petitioner's 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr. on 5/28/2009. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tignor v. United States of America (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernardo Lee Tignor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Susan R. Redmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?