Cox v. United States of America (INMATE3)

Plaintiff: Judson Marshall Cox
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2009cv00448
Filed: May 18, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2011 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION granting 65 Motion for Subpoenas; directing issuance of subpoenas to Murray S. Robinson, Susan Graham James, Leon David Walker III, Billie Forston, and Larry Forston as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 10/5/2011. (br, )
September 28, 2011 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION granting 60 Motion for Subpoena; directing issuance of subpoena on Murray S. Robinson, as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 9/28/2011. (br, )
September 27, 2011 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION granting 57 Motion for Subpoenas; directing issuance and service of subpoenas as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 9/27/2011. (br, )
July 25, 2011 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that, upon consideration of the 51 and 52 motions, and for good cause, it is ORDERED that: (1) The petitioner's 51 motion for subpoenas duces tecum is GRANTED to the extent that the petitioner seeks attorney Leon David Walk er III's case file from the petitioner's original criminal case (Case No. 3:07cr106-WKW); (2) On or before August 5, 2011, Mr. Walker shall produce the case file from the petitioner's original criminal case to the petitioner's counsel, Aylia McKee; (3) In all other respects, the petitioner's 51 motion for subpoenas duces tecum and 52 amended motion for subpoenas duces tecum are DENIED. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 7/25/11. (scn, )
June 14, 2011 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION denying 48 Motion for subpoenas duces tecum. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 6/14/2011. (br, )
March 30, 2011 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing The Federal Defender for the Middle District of Alabama to represent Cox, as further set out; An evidentiary hearing is scheduled for 5/9/2011, at 10:00 a.m., in courtroom 5-A, Frank M. Johnson, Jr. United States Courthouse Complex, One Church Street, Montgomery, Alabama; DIRECTING the Clerk to provide a court reporter for this proceeding; Cox shall be brought to this district not less than a week in advance of the scheduled evidentiary hearing in order to facilitate communicati ons with appointed counsel in preparation for the hearing, as further set out; DIRECTING the Clerk to serve this order upon the Federal Defender for the Middle District of Alabama and to make the case file available as reasonably requested. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 3/30/2011. (furn: Calendar, wr, dh, BOP, USM) (wcl, )
August 11, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Motion for Leave to amend and 11 Motion to Amend his 2255 motion; directing that within 30 days the US shall file a supplemental response, as further set out in order; directing the clerk to provide copies of petitioner's a mended 2255 motion 11 and his affidavit with attachments 13 to attorneys Leon David Walker and Susan Graham James; ORDERING that within 20 days from the date of this order, Mr. Walker and Ms. James shall file with the court affidavits, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 8/11/09. (djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. United States of America (INMATE3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judson Marshall Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Verne H. Speirs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?