Carter v. Jones et al (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: Sean M. Carter
Defendant: Jay Jones, Dr. McFarland, Nurse Steward, Nurse Coggins and Mayor Fuller
Case Number: 3:2009cv00571
Filed: June 18, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Office: Opelika Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Inmate 1983 Complaint filed by Sean M. Carter, that this case be DISMISSED without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 11/23/2009. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr. on 11/9/2009. (dmn)
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re 23 Special Report to Inmate 1983 Complaint, filed by Nurse Steward, Dr. McFarland, Jay Jones, Nurse Coggins. ORDERED that on or before 9/8/2009 Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendants' written report. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 8/18/2009. (dmn)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 21 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr. on 8/17/2009. (dmn)
June 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Inmate 1983 Complaint filed by Sean M. Carter that: 1. Plaintiff's complaint against Defendant Fuller be DISMISSED with prejudice and prior to service of process pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2) (B)(i); 2. Defendant Fuller is DISMISSED as a party to the complaint; and 3. This case with respect to the remaining defendants be referred back to the undersigned for further proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 7/7/2009. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr. on 6/23/2009. (dmn)
June 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and inmate account clerk at the Lee County Detention Center. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 6/22/09. (sl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Jones et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean M. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Steward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Coggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?