Carter v. Department of Corrections et al (INMATE2)

Plaintiff: Sean M. Carter
Defendant: Department of Corrections, J. Jones, L. Torbort and C. Welch
Case Number: 3:2009cv00606
Filed: June 29, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 22, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT is entered in favor of Defendants. The clerk of the court is directed to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable Ira De Ment on 12/22/2009. (cb, )
November 25, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that 22 Motion for Summary Judgment be GRANTED to the extent Defendants seek dismissal of this case due to Plaintiff's failure to properly exhaust available administrative remedies at the Lee County Detention Center; and (2) This case be DISMISSED with prejudice in accordance with the provisions of 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(a) for Plaintiff's failure to exhaust an administrative remedies available to him during his confinement in the Lee County Detention Center. Objections to R&R due by 12/8/2009. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 11/25/2009. (cb, )
September 25, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that on or before October 16, 2009 Plaintiff shall file a response toDefendants' written report. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 9/25/2009. (cb, )
August 28, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 10 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 8/28/09. (sl, )
August 20, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED as follows: (1) The 6 Recommendation is ADOPTED; (2)Plaintiff's complaint against the Department of Corrections is DISMISSED, with prejudice prior to service of process; (2) The Alabama Department of Corrections is DISMISSED as a defendant in this cause of action; and (3) This case, with respect to the allegations set forth against the remaining defendants, be referred back to the Magistrate Judge for appropriate proceedings. Signed by Honorable Ira De Ment on 8/20/2009. (cb, )
July 20, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that:(1) Plaintiff's complaint against the Alabama Department of Corrections be DISMISSED with prejudice prior to service of process; (2) The Alabama Department of Corrections be DISMISSED as a party to the complaint; and (3) This case with respect to the remaining defendants be referred back to the undersigned for further proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 8/3/2009. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 7/20/2009. (cb, )
July 8, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk Lee County Detention Center. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 7/8/2009. (cb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Department of Corrections et al (INMATE2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean M. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Torbort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?