Johnson v. Opelika Police Department et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: Leonardo Johnson
Defendant: Opelika Police Department, Michael Rodgers, Stanley Garret and Officer Davis
Case Number: 3:2010cv00050
Filed: January 19, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: O Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: O
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER as follows: 1. The Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED; 2. Defendant Garrett and Rogers' motion for summary judgment 24 is GRANTED. 3. Plaintiff's complaint against Defendant Davis be and is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. 4. This case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 8/6/2012. (jg, )
March 26, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER overruling the plaintiff's 19 Objections; adopting the 13 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge; dismissing the claims against the Opelika Police Department with prejudice prior to service of process in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i); dismissing Opelika Police Department as a party; and referring the case back to the Magistrate Judge for appropriate proceedings. Signed by Honorable Ira De Ment on 3/26/2010. (br, )
March 10, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION denying 14 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 3/10/2010. (br, )
March 5, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE that: 1. Plaintiff's claims against the Opelika Police Department be DISMISSED with prejudice prior to service of process in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i); 2. The Opeli ka Police Department be DISMISSED as a party to this cause of action; and 3. This case, with respect to the claims against the remaining Defendants, be referred back to the undersigned for appropriate proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 3/19/2010. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 3/5/2010. (br, )
February 3, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 8 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 2/3/2010. (br, )
January 21, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Lee County Detention Center. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 1/21/2010. (br, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Opelika Police Department et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Opelika Police Department
Represented By: Randall C. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Rodgers
Represented By: Randall C. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Garret
Represented By: Randall C. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Davis
Represented By: Randall C. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonardo Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?